Bain v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Mark Douglas Bain
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 2:2020cv00052
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Summons sent to attorney by regular mail.) (am)
August 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff Mark Douglas Bain has filed an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. No. 2). Having considered Bain's application, the Court ORDERS that Bain be allowed to proceed in forma pauperis in this case. The Clerk's Office is directed to file the case and send copies to the U.S. Attorney for the Middle District of Tennessee and the Attorney General of the United States. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 8/31/2020. (am)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b), Fed.R.Civ.P., and the Local Rul of Court. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/28/2020. (am)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Mark Douglas Bain. (am)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Mark Douglas Bain. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am)
August 27, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Matthew A. Jared. (am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bain v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Douglas Bain
Represented By: Matthew A. Jared
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?