Doney v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Lou E. Doney
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 2:2020cv00060
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 KS State Bar status verified as active for Bert Coleman not admitted to this court. (vh)
November 16, 2020 KS State Bar status verified as active for Bert Coleman not admitted to this court - Local counsel required. (kc)
November 13, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Bert Coleman on behalf of Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (Coleman, Bert)
November 13, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for attorney Bert W. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Social Security Administration, Commissioner of. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing, District of Kansas)(Coleman, Bert)
November 4, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of served on 10/13/2020. (vh)
October 21, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General on 10/13/2020. (vh)
October 14, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States Attorney on 10/6/2020. (vh)
September 30, 2020 Filing 11 Summons issued as to the Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (forwarded to USM for service.)(kc) Modified on 9/30/2020 (kc).
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Plaintiff Lou E. Doney has filed an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #8 . Having considered Doney's application, the Court ORDERS that Doney be allowed to proceed in forma pauperis in this case. The Clerk's Office is directed to file the case and send copies to the U.S. Attorney for the Middle District of Tennessee and the Attorney General of the United States. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 9/30/2020. (kc) Modified on 9/30/2020 (kc).
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Melissa Palmer is granted. Signed by Vicki Kinkade on 09/24/2020. (vk) Modified on 9/24/2020 (vk).
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE: This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b), Fed.R.Civ.P., and the Local Rules of Court. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 9/22/2020. (mg)
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Kaludis on behalf of Lou E. Doney (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Service)(Kaludis, William)
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (kc)
September 22, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney Melissa A. Palmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3219681) by Lou E. Doney. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Palmer, Melissa)
September 22, 2020 NY State Bar status verified as active for Melissa A. Palmer not admitted to this court - Local counsel required. (kc)
September 22, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for William M. Kaludis. (mg)
September 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
September 21, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Melissa A. Palmer: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 10/13/2020. (kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doney v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Represented By: Bert Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lou E. Doney
Represented By: Melissa A. Palmer
Represented By: William M. Kaludis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?