Harris-Pravlis v. Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Tara Harris-Pravlis
Defendant: Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00074
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Marshall T. Cook admitted to this court. (dt)
January 12, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Marshall T. Cook on behalf of Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company (Cook, Marshall)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the #1 Complaint. Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company answer due 1/21/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 12/31/2020. (dt)
December 31, 2020 Filing 9 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Wahlheim, William)
December 31, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Wahlheim, William) Modified on 1/4/2021 (dt).
December 28, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed as to Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company through the State of Tennessee Department of Commerce and Insurance served on 12/10/2020. (dt)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b), Fed.R.Civ.P., and the Local Rules of Court. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 11/19/2020. (mg)
November 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/8/2021 at 9:30 AM in Cookeville before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (dt)
November 19, 2020 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (dt)
November 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
November 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3258233), filed by Tara Harris-Pravlis. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris-Pravlis v. Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Harris-Pravlis
Represented By: Samuel D. Payne
Represented By: Lauren W. Travis
Represented By: K. Cody Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: William B. Wahlheim, Jr.
Represented By: Marshall T. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?