Ecoventures Capital Fund, LLC v. Swallows et al
Plaintiff: Ecoventures Capital Fund, LLC
Defendant: Jacky Swallows and Rellie Swallows
Case Number: 2:2021cv00027
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Upon request of the Plaintiff pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) (A)(i) seeking a dismissal before the opposing party has filed any pleadings and upon notifying the Court that the parties have compromised and settled this matter, the Court finds it appropriate to dismiss this matter with full prejudice. Accordingly, this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and the Clerk is directed to close this file. No costs will be taxed. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/28/2021. (ln)
July 26, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE by Ecoventures Capital Fund, LLC re #9 Proposed Order of Dismissal (Moore, Richard)
July 21, 2021 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL filed by Ecoventures Capital Fund, LLC. (Moore, Richard)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/1/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
July 1, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 9/20/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (ln)
July 1, 2021 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Jacky Swallows and Rellie Swallows. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (ln)
July 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ln)
July 1, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln)
July 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
July 1, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Richard Lane Moore admitted to this court. (ln)
June 30, 2021 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ecoventures Capital Fund, LLC. (ln)
June 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jacky Swallows and Rellie Swallows (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3401686) filed by Ecoventures Capital Fund, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Purchase and Sale Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Correspondence to Ms. Cross, #3 Exhibit 3 - Correspondence to Mr. and Mrs. Swallows, #4 Exhibit 4 - Correspondence from Attorney Fields, #5 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ecoventures Capital Fund, LLC v. Swallows et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacky Swallows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rellie Swallows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ecoventures Capital Fund, LLC
Represented By: Richard Lane Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?