Hamilton v. Celina, City of Tennessee et al
Plaintiff: Jason Hamilton
Defendant: Celina, City of Tennessee and Tonya Spears
Case Number: 2:2021cv00035
Filed: August 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed by Jason Hamilton. Tonya Spears served on 9/9/2021. (Looper, Dana)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The motion #10 for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading is GRANTED. Tonya Spears's answer due 10/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 9/17/2021.(ln)
September 17, 2021 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Tonya Spears. (Berexa, Kristin)
September 17, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Kristin Ellis Berexa and Cassandra M. Crane admitted to this court. (vh)
September 16, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Cassandra M. Crane on behalf of All Defendants (Crane, Cassandra)
September 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin Ellis Berexa on behalf of All Defendants (Berexa, Kristin)
September 2, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jason Hamilton. Celina, City of Tennessee waiver sent on 8/30/2021. (Looper, Dana)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/24/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
August 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 11/15/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (vh)
August 23, 2021 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Tonya Spears. (service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (vh)
August 23, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (vh)
August 23, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (vh)
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Celina, City of Tennessee, and Tonya Spears (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3434390), filed by Jason Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Supporting document, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(vh)
August 23, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Dana R. Looper admitted to this court. (vh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton v. Celina, City of Tennessee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Hamilton
Represented By: Dana R. Looper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celina, City of Tennessee
Represented By: Cassandra M. Crane
Represented By: Kristin Ellis Berexa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonya Spears
Represented By: Cassandra M. Crane
Represented By: Kristin Ellis Berexa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?