Kremer v. Reddit, Inc.
Plaintiff: Maxwell Kremer
Defendant: Reddit, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00038
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
2 Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #25 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for William C. Rava to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 11/01/2021. (lh)
October 28, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION for Sanctions by Maxwell Kremer. (jm)
October 28, 2021 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Deny Defendant's Motion to Dismiss/Leave and to Deny Motion of Status Conference filed by Maxwell Kremer. (jm)
October 28, 2021 WA State Bar status verified as active for William C. Rava not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (jm)
October 27, 2021 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Compel, #18 MOTION to Compel, #20 MOTION to Strike MOTION to Quash filed by Reddit, Inc.. (Ray, Jeremy)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: On October 27, 2021, Plaintiff Maxwell Kremer filed a motion for summary judgment on Defendant Reddit, Inc.'s claims against him. (Doc. No. #24 .) Under this Court's Local Rule 7.01(a)(3), the defendant shall file any response in opposition to the motion for summary judgment no later than twenty-one days after being served with the motion. M.D. Tenn. R. 7.01(a)(3) (response). The plaintiff may file an optional reply, limited to five pages, within seven days after service of the response. M.D. Tenn. R. 7.01(a)(4) (reply). If service is made by mail, three days are added to the time period for response or reply in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d). The defendant is warned that failure to file a timely response in opposition to the plaintiff's motion for summary judgment may result in a recommendation that the motion be granted as unopposed or the action be dismissed for failure to prosecute. See M.D. Tenn. R. 7.01(a)(3) (response). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/27/2021. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (jm)
October 27, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for attorney William C. Rava to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3473657) by Reddit, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Ray, Jeremy)
October 25, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Maxwell Kremer. (jm)
October 20, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION FOR STATUS CONFERENCE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING RESOLUTION OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Reddit, Inc.. (Ray, Jeremy)
October 19, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Strike and Quash by Maxwell Kremer. (jm)
October 18, 2021 Filing 23 REPLY in Further Support of its #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Reddit, Inc. (jm)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Kremer's motion to strike Reddit's motion to dismiss (Doc. No. #14 ) is DENIED. Reddit's motion for leave to file a reply in further support of its motion to dismiss and to treat Kremer's motion as a response (Doc. No. #16 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to file Reddit's proposed reply (Doc. No. 16-1) as a separate docket entry. Reddit's motion to dismiss (Doc. No. #8 ) remains pending. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/18/2021. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
October 14, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Compel by Maxwell Kremer. (jm)
October 13, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Compel by Maxwell Kremer. (kc)
October 12, 2021 Filing 17 DENIAL OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT: Accordingly, Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default, (Doc. No. #11 ), is DENIED. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 10/12/2021. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
October 8, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Further Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims and to Treat Plaintiff's Motion to Strike as a Response by Reddit, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Defendant's Reply in Further Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims)(Ray, Jeremy)
October 4, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Maxwell Kremer and re #6 and #10 Requests to Remand filed by Reddit, Inc.. (Ray, Jeremy)
October 1, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Strike by Maxwell Kremer. (jm)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: On September 23, 2021, Defendant Reddit, Inc. filed a motion dismiss pro se Plaintiff Maxwell Kremer's claims against it. (Doc. No. #8 .) Under this Court's Local Rule 7.01(a)(3), the plaintiff shall file any response in opposition to the motion to dismiss no later than fourteen days after being served with the motion. M.D. Tenn. R. 7.01(a)(3) (response). The defendant may file an optional reply, limited to five pages, within seven days after service of the response. M.D. Tenn. R. 7.01(a)(4) (reply). If service is made by mail, three days are added to the time period for response or reply in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d). The plaintiff is warned that failure to file a timely response in opposition to the defendants' motion to dismiss may result in a recommendation that the motion be granted as unopposed or the action be dismissed for failure to prosecute. See M.D. Tenn. R. 7.01(a)(3) (response). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 9/30/2021. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (jm)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: It appears that the Notice of Removal is timely and Reddit has complied with other procedural requirements of the removal statute. See 28 U.S.C. 1446. Accordingly, this action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to oversee service of process, enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of Court. The parties' pending submissions (Doc. Nos. #4 , #8 ) will be considered in due course. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 9/29/2021. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
September 27, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Entry of Default by Maxwell Kremer. (jm)
September 27, 2021 Filing 10 Request to Remand Notice to cancel Notice of Removal by Maxwell Kremer. (jm)
September 23, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Reddit, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 -Screenshot from the reddit.com Website of the Post referenced in the Complaint)(Ray, Jeremy)
September 23, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Reddit, Inc.. (Ray, Jeremy)
September 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing by Reddit, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Ray, Jeremy)
September 21, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#1 : Counsel failed to include the mandatory description of the attached exhibits. Counsel is directed to file a notice that lists each exhibit with a brief description. (jm)
September 20, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST TO REMAND Notice to Cancel Notice of Removal by Maxwell Kremer. (vh)
September 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (jm)
September 17, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jeremy D. Ray admitted to this court. (jm)
September 17, 2021 Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr and Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern added. District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr no longer assigned to case. (jm)
September 17, 2021 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (jm)
September 16, 2021 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Reddit, Inc. (jm)
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Reddit, Inc. from Putnam County Circuit Court, case number 2021-CV-155. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0650-3449524) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kremer v. Reddit, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxwell Kremer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reddit, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy D. Ray
Represented By: William C. Rava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?