Powers v. CTP Mitchell Creek, LLC
Plaintiff: Laurie Jeanne Powers
Defendant: CTP Mitchell Creek, LLC doing business as Mitchell Creek Marina
Case Number: 2:2023cv00059
Filed: September 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Marc Bradley Gilmore admitted to this court. (mg)
October 23, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by CTP Mitchell Creek, LLC.(Gilmore, Marc)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 9/28/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
September 27, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 12/21/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (af)
September 27, 2023 Filing 5 Summons issued as to CTP Mitchell Creek, LLC. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (af)
September 27, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (af)
September 27, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (af)
September 27, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (af)
September 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CTP Mitchell Creek, LLC (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3921417), filed by Laurie Jeanne Powers. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(af)
September 27, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Sarah K. Stein, Jesse Waterman admitted to this court. (af)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powers v. CTP Mitchell Creek, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Jeanne Powers
Represented By: Jesse Waterman
Represented By: Sarah K. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CTP Mitchell Creek, LLC doing business as Mitchell Creek Marina
Represented By: Marc Bradley Gilmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?