Nationwide Insurance Company of America v. Peterson et al
Plaintiff: Nationwide Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Michele Peterson and The AI Fleet, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2024cv00049
Filed: July 12, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2024 Filing 15 SUMMONS returned executed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. The AI Fleet, Inc. served on 6/24/2024. (Baker, Joseph)
July 26, 2024 Filing 14 SUMMONS returned executed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. Michele Peterson served on 6/28/2024. (Baker, Joseph)
July 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: On July 17, 2024, counsel for Defendants filed an unopposed motion to continue the initial case management conference set on September 17, 2024. (Doc. No. #12 ). The motion is GRANTED. The initial case management conference is CONTINUED to October 11, 2024, at 9:30 a.m. Counsel for each party shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 7/19/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) (mg).
July 19, 2024 Reset Hearing: Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is reset for 10/11/2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (mg)
July 18, 2024 NOTICE TO FILER re DE# 8 , 9 : The wrong event was used. The correct event should be Service of Process/Summons Returned Executed. Counsel shall re-file the documents. (mg)
July 17, 2024 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Michele Peterson, The AI Fleet, Inc.. (Gardella, Andrew)
July 17, 2024 Filing 11 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The AI Fleet, Inc.. (Gardella, Andrew)
July 17, 2024 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Michele Peterson, The AI Fleet, Inc..(Gardella, Andrew)
July 17, 2024 Filing 9 ***DISREGARD***AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint & Summons served on The AI Fleet, Inc. on June 24, 2024, filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. (Baker, Joseph) Modified on 7/18/2024 (mg).
July 17, 2024 Filing 8 ***DISREGARD***AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint & Summons served on Michele Peterson on June 28, 2024, filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. (Baker, Joseph) Modified on 7/18/2024 (mg).
July 16, 2024 Filing 7 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. (Baker, Joseph)
July 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/15/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
July 12, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 9/17/2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (sb)
July 12, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (sb)
July 12, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (sb)
July 12, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (sb)
July 12, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Michele Peterson, The AI Fleet, Inc. from Putnam County Circuit Court, case number 2024-cv-133. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNMDC-4118680) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Putnam County Circuit Court Complaint, #2 Attachment Putnam County Circuit Court Notice of Removal, #3 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(sb)
July 12, 2024 TN State Bar status verified as active for Joseph B. Baker, Andrew Gardella admitted to this court. (sb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationwide Insurance Company of America v. Peterson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Peterson
Represented By: Andrew Gardella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The AI Fleet, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Gardella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Joseph B. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?