Grant, et al v. Metro Govt of Nash, et al
Plaintiff: Claude Grant, Oralene Day, Princess Martindale, Faletha B. Reid, Darryl McKibbens, Darrel Gant, Antonio McKissack, Pamela Tucker and Sandra Derrick
Defendant: Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County, Tennessee
Case Number: 3:2004cv00630
Filed: July 16, 2004
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: William J. Haynes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 385 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 3/27/2017. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh) Modified on 3/28/2017 (eh). Modified on 3/28/2017 (eh).
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 361 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Plaintiffs' motion to set disparate treatment claims for trial (Doc. No. 320 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Defendant's motion to strike Plaintiffs' remarks about defense counsel (Doc. No. 323 ) is DENIED. D efendants' motion to dismiss for lack of prosecution (Doc. No. 327 ) is DENIED. Regarding the motion to amend the allocation of the special masters' expenses (Doc. No. 350), Plaintiffs' response is due July 12, 2016 and Defendant may file a reply by July 22, 2016. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/11/2016. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER denying 247 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 08/20/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Text Search Order) (ab)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER: In accordance with the Memorandum filed, absent a material factual dispute as to the actual amounts, the named Plaintiffs are AWARDED backpay. These backpay awards are subject to the two-year limitations, measured from the date of each Plainti ff's original charges filed with the Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, as set forth in 42 U.S.C. § 2000e-5(g). The named Plaintiffs are also AWARDED prejudgment interest for these backpay awards from the same time period. Absent a ma terial factual dispute as to the amounts, the Court also will award front-pay to each Plaintiff based on the rate of the backpay award. The parties have 10 days from the date of this Order to submit three names to the Court for the appointment of a S pecial Master. It is further ORDERED that for one year, members of the Metro Civil Service Commission or its designees shall serve as members of the oral interview team for all Metro Water Services promotions, including lateral transfers. The intervi ew panel for these promotion interviews may not include any Metro Water Services employees. Metro Water Services may designate a proctor to attend the interview. Signed by District Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 07/22/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Text Search Order)(ab)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant, et al v. Metro Govt of Nash, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claude Grant
Represented By: Martin D. Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oralene Day
Represented By: Martin D. Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Princess Martindale
Represented By: Martin D. Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faletha B. Reid
Represented By: Martin D. Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl McKibbens
Represented By: Martin D. Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrel Gant
Represented By: Martin D. Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio McKissack
Represented By: Martin D. Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Tucker
Represented By: Martin D. Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Derrick
Represented By: Martin D. Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County, Tennessee
Represented By: Allison L. Bussell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?