Cal IV Entertainment, LLC v. Youtube, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff, a music publishing company, alleges that Defendants infringed its copyrights by allowing users to upload videos containing plaintiff's copyrighted works and providing access to certain content filtering technologies only to existing business partners.

Plaintiff: Cal IV Entertainment, LLC
Defendant: Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC and Google, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2007cv00617
Filed: June 7, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: John S. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Robert Echols
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 24
ORDER: Pltf has submitted a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. This action is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert Echols on 7/10/07. (jb)
July 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 22
ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint; Defts answer due 7/24/2007 . Signed by Judge John S. Bryant on 7/2/07. (km, )
June 29, 2007 Filing 18
NOTICE of Appearance by Laurel Alyson Johnston on behalf of Cal IV Entertainment, LLC (Johnston, Laurel)
June 18, 2007 Filing 9
SUMMONS returned executed by Cal IV Entertainment, LLC. Google, Inc. served on 6/13/2007. (Martin, Gerald)
June 14, 2007 Filing 7
SUMMONS returned executed by Cal IV Entertainment, LLC. Youtube, LLC served on 6/12/2007. (Martin, Gerald)
June 8, 2007 Filing 6
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cal IV Entertainment, LLC. (Martin, Gerald)
June 7, 2007 Filing 3
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for Monday, 7/30/2007 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 776 before Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant. (rm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cal IV Entertainment, LLC v. Youtube, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cal IV Entertainment, LLC
Represented By: Gerald E. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Youtube, Inc.
Represented By: Robb S. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Youtube, LLC
Represented By: Robb S. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Robb S. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?