Clark v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Plaintiff: Mary Alice Clark
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Case Number: 3:2007cv01043
Filed: October 29, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Joe Brown
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: Counsel in the cases above shall comply with the court's prior orders (MDL Docs. 7344, 7345) NOT LATER THAN April 23, 2014. No further extensions of time will be granted absent good cause shown. Counsel representing the plaintiffs in the cases above are forewarned that continued failure to comply with the court's prior orders in this matter may result in the impositionof sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 4/16/14. Associated Cases: 3:06-md-01760, 3:07-cv-01043, 3:07-cv-01072, 3:07-cv-01171, 3:08-cv-00020, 3:08-cv-00560(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
December 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: Pending before the Court is a Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge (Docket No. 7200), to which no Objections have been filed. The Court has reviewed the Report and Recommendation and the file. The Report and Recommendation is a dopted and approved. Accordingly, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 7047) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 12/27/13.Associated Cases: 3:06-md-01760, 3:07-cv-01043(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Magistrate Judge Brown RECOMMENDS that the Motion to Dismiss filed by NPC (MDL Doc. 7047; Related Case 33) be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 12/10/13. Associated Cases: 3:06-md-01760, 3:07-cv-01043(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: The amended motion to substitute has corrected the substitution defect in the original motion. Accordingly, the amended motion to substitute Ms. Pace as the plaintiff in this case (MDL Doc. 7155; Related Case 38) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 12/5/13. Associated Cases: 3:06-md-01760, 3:07-cv-01043(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: Mr. Vecchione is ORDERED to pay a sanction in the amount of $1,000.00 for the blatant disregard for the orders of the court described herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 11/19/13. Associated Cases: 3:06-md-01760, 3:07-cv-01043(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying (6746) Motion to Substitute Party. in case 3:06-md-01760; denying (28) Motion to Substitute Party. in case 3:07-cv-01043. Counsel may amend the motion not later than September 30, 2013. Counsel is forewarned that failure to amend b y September 30, 2013 may result in the Magistrate Judge recommending that this case be dismissed with prejudice for failure to comply with the Case Management Order, and for failure to comply with Rule 25 (a)(1), Fed. R. Civ. P. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 9/9/13.Associated Cases: 3:06-md-01760, 3:07-cv-01043(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Alice Clark
Represented By: John Julian Vecchione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Katharine R. Latimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?