Murphy et al v. Style Records Limited et al
Plaintiff: Taryn Murphy and Chris Landon
Defendant: Style Records Limited and Sergy Lazarev
Case Number: 3:2010cv00530
Filed: June 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Sumner
Presiding Judge: Robert Echols
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/23/2015. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/10/2013. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 AGREED ORDER: The deadline to file dispositive motions is extended to 8/28/2013, the deadline to file responses to dispositive motions is extended to 9/18/2013, and the deadline to file replies, if any, is extended to 10/2/2013. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/13/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/12/2012. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/22/2012. (eh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy et al v. Style Records Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taryn Murphy
Represented By: G. Kline Preston, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Landon
Represented By: G. Kline Preston, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Style Records Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergy Lazarev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?