Harden v. Allied Barton Security Service
Plaintiff: Cecil Ray Harden
Defendant: Allied Barton Security Service
Case Number: 3:2010cv00779
Filed: August 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: William J. Haynes
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER: Pursuant to the Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice 70 filed by the parties, this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 9/26/13. (dt)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER: Jury Trial set for 10/15/2013 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A826 before District Judge Kevin H. Sharp. Pretrial Conference set for 9/30/2013 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom A826 before District Judge Kevin H. Sharp. Exhibit List due by 9/25/2013. Witness List due by 9/25/2013. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/25/2013. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 8/21/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER: On June 7, 2013, this Court entered an Order and Memorandum, granting Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, except with respect to Plaintiff's claim that he was discharged because of his race. Defendant has filed a Motion for Reconsideration and Request for Oral Argument (Docket No. 66 ). Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration and Request for Oral Argument (Docket No. 66 ) is DENIED. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 8/1/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER: For the reasons explained in the accompanying Memorandum, the Motion for Summary Judgment 45 filed by Defendant Allied Barton Security Service is hereby GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The Motion is GRANTED with respect to Plaintiff Ceci l Ray Harden's failure to promote claims, and his claim that he was terminated in retaliation for participating in an Equal Employment Opportunity Commission investigation, but DENIED with respect to Plaintiff's claim that he was terminated on the basis of his race. A final pretrialconference on that remaining claim will be held on Monday, September 30, 2013, at 1:30 p.m. with the jury trial to commence at 9:00 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15, 2013. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 6/7/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting 61 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines Pending Court's Ruling on Summary Judgment Motion. The trial and pretrial conference are hereby continued. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 7/9/12. (dt)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER: Jury Trial set for 8/14/2012 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Kevin H. Sharp. Pretrial Conference set for 7/23/2012 at 3:00 PM before District Judge Kevin H. Sharp. Exhibit List and Witness List due by 7/18/2012. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/18/2012. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 6/22/12. (dt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harden v. Allied Barton Security Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecil Ray Harden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Barton Security Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?