Navistar Financial Corporation v. C.C.C. Trucking, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Navistar Financial Corporation
Defendant: C.C.C. Trucking, Inc. and Chris Cunningham
Case Number: 3:2010cv01244
Filed: December 30, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the reasons set forth herein, Navistar is ORDERED to file the submissions discussed in this order on or before 4/2/2012. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/13/12. (dt)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 11/22/2011 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles. By 12:00 noon on Thursday, 11/17/2011, Plaintiff and Defendant shall deliver under seal, directly to Ms. Holly Vila, Courtroom Deputy to Magistrate Judge Knowles, ex parte, separate settlement conference statements which shall specify their respective settlement positions. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 9/9/11. (dt)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AS AMENDED: Motion to Amend Pleadings due by 9/16/2011. Discovery due by 7/1/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 2/3/2012. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/31/11. (dt)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference is reset for 3/25/2011 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/12/11. (dt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Navistar Financial Corporation v. C.C.C. Trucking, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Navistar Financial Corporation
Represented By: Rhonda Scott Kinslow
Represented By: Rachel L. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.C.C. Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Marc A. Walwyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Cunningham
Represented By: Marc A. Walwyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?