Meyer v. Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Plaintiff: Charles Michael Meyer
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv00402
Filed: April 29, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Williamson
Presiding Judge: Joe Brown
Presiding Judge: John T. Nixon
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: For the reasons stated above, the Magistrate Judge recommends that sanctions be imposed in the amount of $20,837.05. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 9/13/12. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (afs)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting 73 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Senior Judge John T. Nixon on 8/10/12. (dt)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 3/26/2012 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. To participate in the conference call, parties should call 615-695-2851 at the scheduled time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 3/14/12. (dt)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Telephone Conference held on 1/18/2012. The parties advised that they will be scheduling private mediation in this matter. The parties are directed to complete these necessary Rule 30(b)(6) depositions on or before 3/15/2012. The present sche duling order 11 is amended to provide that all discovery will close by 4/6/2012. Dispositive motions will be due 4/27/2012. The final pretrial conference and trial dates set by Judge Nixon will remain unchanged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 1/19/12. (dt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meyer v. Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Represented By: James C. Bradshaw, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Michael Meyer
Represented By: Justin S. Gilbert
Represented By: Jonathan L. Bobbitt
Represented By: Jessica F. Salonus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?