Freeman et al v. Troutt et al
Plaintiff: Jaworski McMurry, Timothy Parsons, Johnny Davis, Billy Dishman, LaBron Luke, Robert Freeman and Kenneth Blaylock
Defendant: Sonya Troutt and Sonny Weatherford
Case Number: 3:2012cv00266
Filed: March 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Sumner
Presiding Judge: Kevin H. Sharp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER: Accordingly, the Court hereby rules as follows: (1) The Report and Recommendation (Docket Entry No. 124) is hereby ACCEPTED and APPROVED; (2) Defendants Trout and Weatherford's Motion to Dismiss for Plaintiffs Robert Freeman, Johnny Davi s and Billy Dishman's Failure to Serve Answers to Discovery (Docket Entry No. 112) is hereby GRANTED; and (3) This case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk is directed to enter Judgment in a separate document in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 4/15/14. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 124 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Magistrate Judge Knowles recommends that Defendants' Troutt and Weatherford's Motion to Dismiss 112 be GRANTED, and that Plaintiffs Robert Freeman, Johnny Davis, and Billy Dishman be terminated as parties to this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 3/13/14. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 120 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: For the foregoing reasons, the undersigned concludes that, viewing all the facts and inferences in favor of the nonmoving party, there is no genuine issue as to any material fact and Defendant SHP is entitled to a judgmen t as a matter of law. The undersigned therefore recommends that the instant Motion for Summary Judgment 103 be GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 2/26/14. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER: Jury Trial set for 5/20/2014 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Kevin H. Sharp. Pretrial Conference set for 5/14/2014 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 661 before Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles. Exhibit List and Witness List due by 5/5/2014. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/5/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 8/7/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER: Jury Trial set for 5/20/2014 09:00 AM before District Judge Kevin H. Sharp. The Magistrate Judge shall conduct the pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. He shall assist the plaintiff with the preparation of subpoenas, discuss exhib its, instructions and all other matters necessary for having the case prepared to be tried on the date set. The Magistrate Judge has been managing this case. If he considers it appropriate to appoint counsel to represent the plaintiff at trial, he should do so. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 6/12/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM OPINION: An appropriate order will enter. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 6/20/12. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(tmw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman et al v. Troutt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonya Troutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonny Weatherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaworski McMurry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Dishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaBron Luke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Blaylock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?