Cunningham v. Ocwen Financial et al

Plaintiff: Craig Cunningham
Defendant: Ocwen Financial, Litton Loan Servicing, Equifax, Trans Union, Experian and John/Jane Doe 1-10
Case Number: 3:2012cv00440
Filed: May 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Referring Judge: Joe Brown
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER: This suit is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE in its entirety. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear its own costs and fees. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/3/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The defendants' Objections are not persuasive and they are, therefore, OVERRULED. The Report and Recommendation (Docket No. 142 ) is ACCEPTED and made the findings of fact and conclusions of law of t his court. For the reasons expressed therein, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendants' Motion for Partial Dismissal (Docket No. 131 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, as detailed in the Report and Recommendation. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/19/2014. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 142 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The undersigned recommends that the defendants' Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED in regard to Plaintiffs claims that Defendants': 1) reported on loans they did not own; 2) failed to report the results of their inve stigation to him; 3) initially reported inaccurate information to CRAs; and 4) failed to provide an adverse action notice; and that those claims be DISMISSED. The Magistrate Judge also recommends that the defendants' Motion to Dismiss be DENI ED in regard to Plaintiff's claims that Defendants failed to conduct reasonable investigations or that they failed to "modify, delete, or permanently block" inaccurate information subsequent to an investigation; and that those claims be allowed to PROCEED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 12/10/2013. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 PROTECTIVE ORDER (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Brown, Joe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunningham v. Ocwen Financial et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Financial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Litton Loan Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?