Farmer v. Parker et al
Plaintiff: Keith Lamont Farmer
Defendant: Chris Parker, Daron Hall, Davidson County Sheriff's Office and Metro Government
Case Number: 3:2012cv00489
Filed: May 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Joe Brown
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER denying as moot 253 Motion to Require Appellant to Order Transcript. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/26/2014. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.) (ds)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER: The plaintiff is directed, within 21 days from the date of entry of this order on the docket, to file a response to the defendant's pending Motion 253 . Should the plaintiff fail to file a response within the specified period of time, the Court shall presume that the plaintiff does not oppose the defendant's Motion. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/24/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 231 JUDGMENT in favor of Chris Parker against Keith Lamont Farmer. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/18/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER: Granting Motion for Production of Prisoners for Trial Date. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/3/14. (xc: Jose Hall, Kevin Lillard, Timothy Noel Fields and Warden of facilities were prisoners are located by regular and certified mail. Sgt. Rita Reed via email.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum, defendant Chris Parker's Second Motion for Summary Judgment 159 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The plaintiff's excessive force claim with respect to the morning incident will proceed to trial, subject to the clarifications set forth in the accompanying Memorandum. Farmer's remaining theories of liability are hereby DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/21/14. (dt)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER: A settlement conference was held on November 18, 2013. The Magistrate Judge asked the parties to consider one aspect to the case and get back with him by Friday, November 22, 2013 with a response. If an agreement is not reached then the Magistrate Judge will return the file to Judge Trauger on Monday. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 11/18/13. (dt)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER TO PRODUCE: The Warden of the Turney Center Industrial Complex, 1499 R.W. Moore Memorial Highway, Only, Tennessee, where the plaintiff is presently confined, produce and deliver Keith Lamont Farmer, to this hearing no later than 9:30 a.m., o n Monday, November 18, 2013, to Courtroom No. 783, U.S. Courthouse, 801 Broadway, Nashville, before the Magistrate Judge. This Order to Produce shall be in effect for any subsequent days that the hearing may continue and the plaintiff shall be returned at the conclusion of the hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 11/12/13. (xc: Sgt. Reed via e-mail. Warden via fax.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting re 151 MOTION for Extension of Deadline for Filing Dispositive Motions filed by Chris Parker. Dispositive Motions due by 12/13/2013. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/16/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 11/18/2013 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. By 12:00 NOON on Wednesday, November 13, 2013, Plaintiff and Defendants shall email to the undersigned at brownchambers@tnmd.uscourts.gov, ex parte, separate settlement conference statements which shall specify their respective settlement positions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 10/10/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 10/10/2013 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. To participate in the conference call, the parties are required to call (615) 695-2851 at the scheduled time. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 9/25/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 143 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/11/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 5/28/2013 at 1:00 PM before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. The conference will take place in Judge Traugers chambers, and lead counsel for the parties shall attend. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/20/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER: The May 13th conference with the undersigned is therefore CANCELED and will be reset by Judge Trauger before her. The Clerk is directed to return the file to Judge Trauger. Judge Magistrate Judge Joe Brown no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 5/13/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER: The Rule 16 case management conference in this matter is reset for 5/13/2013 at 1:00 PM. The conference will be held in Chambers instead of the courtroom. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 5/8/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER: A Rule 16 Case Management Conference is set for 5/7/2013 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 4/16/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER denying 104 Motion for Reconsider/Objection to Magistrate Order. The Magistrate Judge has ordered the Defendant to send the Plaintiff a copy of the transcript to see if the Plaintiff has any corrections to make to the transcript. The Plain tiff must return the transcript with any corrections to the Defendant. The Magistrate Judge will stand by his order in that the Defendant provide the Plaintiff a copy of the video tape of the incident without reimbursement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 2/28/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER: For the reasons stated in this order, the Clerk will not issue any of the subpoenas sent by the Plaintiff at this time. The documents may be filed as requests for subpoenas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 2/20/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER: The Plaintiff has written a letter to the Court asking about the scheduling of the final pretrial conference and the requirements for that conference. The Magistrate Judge will normally enter an order setting the dates and requirements for t he final pretrial conference and the trial approximately two months before the trial date. The Plaintiff has filed a pleading entitled "Plaintiff's Answer in Response to Court Order" 89 . If the Plaintiff intended this to be an appe al of the Magistrate Judges order denying his motion to amend 86 , it should have been labeled as an appeal as stated in the last sentence of the Magistrate Judges order. If it is simply a motion for the Magistrate Judge to reconsider his order, it is DENIED. The Magistrate Judge stands by his original order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 2/5/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER: The Plaintiff has sent the Court a letter requesting a copy of his original complaint in this matter 1 . The Clerk is directed to send a copy of the complaint to the Plaintiff by regular mail. In the future, the Plaintiff should NOT send letters to the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 11/19/12. (xc:Pro se party order and copy of complaint by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 6/27/2013 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. An order to produce the plaintiff for the pretrial conference will be entered at the appropriate time. This action is set for a jury trial on 7/30/2013 at 9:00 a.m. before Judge Trauger. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 11/7/12. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER: Presently pending are two motions: Docket Entry 57 for leave to take additional interrogatories; and Docket Entry 58 , a motion to take the Plaintiff's deposition. Both of these motions are GRANTED. Since the Defendants have been allow ed 40 interrogatories, the Magistrate Judge will also increase the Plaintiff's interrogatories to 40 as well. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 10/30/12. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/15/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 3/15/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 10/16/12. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: The Court has reviewed these pleadings and the record de novo and finds that the plaintiffs objections lack merit. Therefore, the plaintiff's objections are OVERRULED. The Report and Recommendation 40 is ADOPTED AND APPROVED in all resp ects. Defendants' Motions to Dismiss 25 & 27 are hereby GRANTED and the claims against them are DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/4/12. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) Modified Text on 10/5/2012 (dt).
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: The Magistrate Judge has received a document entitled "Response to Answer by Defendant Chris Parker." Unfortunately, the Plaintiff lists the wrong case number for his case. The case involving Defendant Chris Parker is 3:12-489, not 3 :12-434. In this case, the Response to Answer by Defendant Chris Parker will be filed. However, there is no provision under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for a response to an answer. The Magistrate Judge in this case has submitted a report and recommendation recommending that the Plaintiff's case against Sheriff Hall and the Metropolitan Government of Nashville, Davidson County, be dismissed. The Plaintiff was advised he had 14 days to object to the report and recommendation. It appe ars he has filed a document entitled "Response to Memorandum." The Clerk should docket this as an objection to the Report and Recommendation 40 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 10/1/12. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Magistrate Judge Brown RECOMMENDS that the Court Grant the Defendants' Motions to Dismiss 25 and 27 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 9/17/12. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: The Clerk has received a letter from the Plaintiff in this matter 30 . The letter seems to make some mention of a request for the appointment of counsel. To the extent this is a request for appointment of counsel, it is DENIED. The Plaintiff may have until 8/20/2012, to file a proper response to two motions to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 8/7/12. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(dt)
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The Magistrate Judge provided the Plaintiff with a sample certificate of service, which the should use on all future pleadings that he files with the Court. For some strange reason the Plaintiff signed the sample and returned it to the Court. The Clerk may docket this correspondence from the Plaintiff simply as a certificate of service. So far as the Magistrate Judge can tell it has no effect on the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 6/21/12. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(dt)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to send the Plaintiff a copy of the Court's Local Rules. The Magistrate Judge will consider this letter as a request for a jury demand and the Clerk will amend the docket sheet to so reflect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 5/31/12. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(dt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farmer v. Parker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daron Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davidson County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Lamont Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?