Phipps et al v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

Plaintiff: Cheryl Phipps, Bobbi Millner and Shawn Gibbons
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv01009
Filed: October 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER dismissing 253 Motion to Deny Class Certification. Signed by Judge David M. Lawson on 6/21/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER granting 164 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 3/7/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER: Status Conference set for 8/15/2014 at 2:00 PM before Chief Judge William J. Haynes Jr. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 7/25/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Aleta A. Trauger recused. Case reassigned to Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/22/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum, the plaintiffs' Motion to Certify for Interlocutory Review and for Stay of Proceedings Pending Interlocutory Appeal 57 is hereby GRANTED. The court hereby CERTIFIES FOR INTERLOCU TORY APPEAL its February 20, 2013 Order 56 . The case is hereby STAYED pending any appeal and the resolution thereof. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/13/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion to Ascertain Status of Pending Motion 69 is GRANTED. This motion remains for resolution by the court, and the court will dispose of it as soon as reasonably possible. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/5/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting 62 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/20/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum, the defendant's Motion to Dismiss in Part Plaintiffs' Complaint or in the Alternative to Strike Class Claims 19 is GRANTED and the putative class claims are hereby DISMIS SED WITH PREJUDICE. The named plaintiffs' individual claims, which were not subject to the defendant's motion, will proceed. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/20/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting 23 Motion for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/29/2013. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: Joint Motion to Set Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Judicial Notice 27 is Granted. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/1/12. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The plaintiffs' Motion to Continue Deadline to Seek Class Determination 9 is GRANTED. The deadline for the plaintiffs to move for a class determination is STAYED until further order of the court. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/17/12. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phipps et al v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Phipps
Represented By: George Edward Barrett
Represented By: David W. Garrison
Represented By: Brad Seligman
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Represented By: Scott P. Tift
Represented By: Christine Webber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbi Millner
Represented By: George Edward Barrett
Represented By: David W. Garrison
Represented By: Brad Seligman
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Represented By: Scott P. Tift
Represented By: Christine Webber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Gibbons
Represented By: George Edward Barrett
Represented By: David W. Garrison
Represented By: Brad Seligman
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Represented By: Scott P. Tift
Represented By: Christine Webber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Catherine Conway
Represented By: Aubrey B. Harwell, Jr.
Represented By: Gerald David Neenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?