USW Industry 401(K) Fund and its Trustees et al v. Conti Enterprises, Inc.
Plaintiff: USW Industry 401(K) Fund and its Trustees, Mark Entringer, Gary Beevers, James Kidder, Jon Geenen, Martin Everhart, Stan Johnson and Dale Olson
Defendant: Conti Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00139
Filed: February 14, 2013
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: The initial case management conference scheduled for October 28,2013 is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/23/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 16 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 7/26/2013 at 11:15 AM before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/29/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference 12 is Granted. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 6/3/2013 at 3:30 PM before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/23/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USW Industry 401(K) Fund and its Trustees et al v. Conti Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USW Industry 401(K) Fund and its Trustees
Represented By: Owen M. Rumelt
Represented By: Allison Madan
Represented By: William Michael Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Entringer
Represented By: Owen M. Rumelt
Represented By: Allison Madan
Represented By: William Michael Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Beevers
Represented By: Owen M. Rumelt
Represented By: Allison Madan
Represented By: William Michael Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Kidder
Represented By: Owen M. Rumelt
Represented By: Allison Madan
Represented By: William Michael Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Geenen
Represented By: William Michael Hamilton
Represented By: Allison Madan
Represented By: Owen M. Rumelt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Everhart
Represented By: William Michael Hamilton
Represented By: Allison Madan
Represented By: Owen M. Rumelt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stan Johnson
Represented By: Owen M. Rumelt
Represented By: Allison Madan
Represented By: William Michael Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Olson
Represented By: Owen M. Rumelt
Represented By: Allison Madan
Represented By: William Michael Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conti Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?