O'Connor et al v. Cunningham et al

Plaintiff: Tabetha O'Connor, Ricky O'Connor, Jane Doe and Shawn O'Connor
Defendant: Christopher Cunningham and Sumner County, Tennessee
Case Number: 3:2013cv00229
Filed: March 15, 2013
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Sumner
Referring Judge: E. Clifton Knowles
Presiding Judge: John T. Nixon
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Pending before the Court is a Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge (Doc. No. 57), to which no Objections have been filed. The Court has reviewed the Report and Recommendation and conducted a de novo review of the record. The Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment filed by (Doc. No. 40 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk shall enter judgment for Plaintiff Jane Doe against Defendant Christop her Cunningham for $300,000.00 in compensatory damages, and $300,000.00 in punitive damages. The Clerk shall enter judgment for Plaintiffs Tabetha O'Connor, Ricky O'Connor, and Shawn O'Connor against Defendant Christopher Cunningham for $75,000.00 each in compensatory damages, and $75,000.00 each in punitive damages. This is the final order in this case. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/12/2016. (eh)
July 25, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The undersigned recommends that compensatory damages of $300,000 be awarded to Jane Doe against Defendant Christopher Cunningham. The undersigned further recommends that Tabetha O'Connor, Ricky O'Connor, an d Shawn OConnor be awarded compensatory damages of $75,000 each against Defendant Cunningham. The undersigned further recommends that punitive damages of $300,000 be awarded to Jane Doe against Defendant Christopher Cunningham. The unders igned further recommends that Tabetha O'Connor, Ricky O'Connor, and Shawn O'Connor be awarded punitive damages of $75,000 each against Defendant Cunningham. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 7/25/2016. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
June 28, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 6/28/2016. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
July 17, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Jury Trial set for 10/28/2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Judge John T. Nixon. Pretrial Conference set for 10/17/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Judge John T. Nixon. Amended Pleadings due by 11/8/2013. Discovery due by 3/13/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 6/13/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 7/17/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)
May 3, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference 6 is Granted. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 6/5/2013 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 5/3/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Connor et al v. Cunningham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tabetha O'Connor
Represented By: Andrew C. Clarke
Represented By: Hugh Edward Green, Jr.
Represented By: John L. Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky O'Connor
Represented By: Andrew C. Clarke
Represented By: Hugh Edward Green, Jr.
Represented By: John L. Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Andrew C. Clarke
Represented By: Hugh Edward Green, Jr.
Represented By: John L. Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn O'Connor
Represented By: Andrew C. Clarke
Represented By: Hugh Edward Green, Jr.
Represented By: John L. Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumner County, Tennessee
Represented By: Leah May Dennen
Represented By: Alvin Scott Derrick
Represented By: Thomas B. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?