Bowen v. Paisley et al

Plaintiff: Amy Elizabeth Connor Bowen
Defendant: Brad Douglas Paisley, Carrie Marie Underwood, John Kelley Lovelace, Charles Christopher Dubois, Frank Mandeville Rogers, V, Sea Gayle Music, LLC, EMI April Music, Inc., EMI Music Publishing, Inc. and Sony Music Holding, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00414
Filed: May 1, 2013
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Williamson
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 25, 2016 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For the reasons discussed in the accompanying Memorandum, the court DENIES the defendants' Motion to Exclude the Reports and Testimony of Judith Finell (Doc. No. 113 ) and GRANTS the defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. No. 115 ). This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Entry of this Order shall constitute the judgment in this case. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/25/2016. (hb)
September 24, 2015 102 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 96 Motion for Leave to Amend. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/24/2015. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
June 16, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/16/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
December 3, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 50 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/3/2013. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
July 8, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Motion for Leave to File Materials Manually. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/8/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowen v. Paisley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Elizabeth Connor Bowen
Represented By: Christopher Caleb Connor
Represented By: Kenneth Luke Connor
Represented By: Richard G. Sanders, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Douglas Paisley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie Marie Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kelley Lovelace
Represented By: Timothy L. Warnock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Christopher Dubois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Mandeville Rogers, V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sea Gayle Music, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMI April Music, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy L. Warnock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMI Music Publishing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Music Holding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?