Buckley et al v. CCA/Metro Davidson Co. Detention Facility et al
Plaintiff: Terrance H. Buckley
Defendant: f/n/u Whitlow, f/n/u Tindall, f/n/u Sullivan, f/n/u Gums, f/n/u Inman, f/n/u Hendrix, f/n/u Gayle, f/n/u Quenzela, f/n/u Collins, F/N/U Maxwell, f/n/u Fitzgerald, f/n/u Bermudez and f/n/u Fisher
Case Number: 3:2013cv01117
Filed: October 8, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Juliet E. Griffin
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: On August 13, 2014, the Magistrate Judge issued a Report and Recommendation (Docket No. 103), to which no timely objections have been filed. The Report and Recommendation is therefore ACCEPTED and made the findings of fact and conclusions of law of this court. For the reasons expressed therein, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion For Summary Judgment (Docket No. 68 ) and Motion For Judgment on the Pleadings (Docket No. 86 ) are hereby GRANTED, a nd this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to all defendants. This Order shall constitute the judgment in this cause. It is so ORDERED. ENTER this 3rd day of September 2014. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/3/2014. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(eh)
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Court respectfully RECOMMENDS that the motion for summary judgment (Docket Entry No. 68) and motion for judgment on the pleadings (Docket Entry No. 86) be GRANTED and this action be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to all Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 8/13/2014. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting 67 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; denying 63 and 66 Requests for Issuance of Subpoenas. In light of the motion for summary judgment, the evidentiary hearing currently set for June 11, 2014, is CANCELLED. The plaintiff shall have until June 14, 2014, to file a response to the motion for summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 5/1/14. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER: The Report and Recommendation is therefore ACCEPTED and made the findings of fact and conclusions of law of this court. For the reasons expressed therein, it is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiff's Motion For Temporary Restraining Order 40 is DENIED. This case is returned to the Magistrate Judge for further handling under the original referral Order. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/24/14. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER denying 50 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk is directed to re-issue process to Michael Sullivan at the address provided by CCA. The summons and Marshal Form - 285 shall be maintained UNDER SEAL, and the Marshal shall file the return of service UNDER SEAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 4/9/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Accordingly, the Court respectfully RECOMMENDS that the plaintiff's motion (Docket Entry No. 40) for a temporary restraining order be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 3/14/14. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buckley et al v. CCA/Metro Davidson Co. Detention Facility et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: f/n/u Whitlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: f/n/u Tindall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: f/n/u Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: f/n/u Gums
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: f/n/u Inman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: f/n/u Hendrix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: f/n/u Gayle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: f/n/u Quenzela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: f/n/u Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F/N/U Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: f/n/u Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: f/n/u Bermudez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: f/n/u Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance H. Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?