Facepets.com, LLC v. Facebook, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Facepets.com, LLC
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv00507
Filed: February 14, 2014
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Referring Judge: Juliet E. Griffin
Presiding Judge: John T. Nixon
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2014 16 Featured Case ORDER: This case is DISMISSED without prejudice and the Clerk is directed to close this case on the records of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 5/22/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
May 22, 2014 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Facepets.com, LLC (Martin, Anne)
May 7, 2014 14 DECLARATION of Lori F. Mayall filed by Facebook, Inc. re: 12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Facepets.com, LLC's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh A - Emails between counsel, # 2 Exhibit Exh B - Additional Emails between counsel)(Harvey, Timothy)
May 7, 2014 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of 12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Facepets.com, LLC's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment filed by Facebook, Inc. . (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Unreported Cases)(Harvey, Timothy)
May 7, 2014 12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Facepets.com, LLC's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh A - Screenshot of Facepets.com)(Harvey, Timothy)
April 10, 2014 Bar status of Attys Marcus D. Peterson and Bobby Ghajar of CA verified as active this date. (tmw)
April 9, 2014 11 Featured Case ORDER granting 9 and 10 Motions for Marcus Peterson and Bobby Ghajar to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 4/9/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
April 7, 2014 10 MOTION for attorney(s) Bobby Ghajar to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-1740936) by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing (Ghajar))(Harvey, Timothy)
April 7, 2014 9 MOTION for attorney(s) Marcus D. Peterson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-1740927) by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing (Peterson))(Harvey, Timothy)
April 3, 2014 Bar status of Attys Tim Harvey and W. Russell Taber of TN verified as active this date. (tmw)
April 2, 2014 8 Featured Case ORDER granting 7 Motion to Continue case mgt conference. The initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED from April 7, 2014, to Tuesday, June 10, 2014, at 12:00 noon, in Courtroom 764, U.S. Courthouse, 801 Broadway, Nashville, TN. Counsel shall e-file the proposed case mgt order prior to the initial case management conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 4/2/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
April 1, 2014 7 Joint MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference by Facepets.com, LLC. (Martin, Anne)
April 1, 2014 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy G. Harvey on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Harvey, Timothy)
March 14, 2014 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Facepets.com, LLC. Facebook, Inc. waiver sent on 3/13/2014. (Martin, Anne)
February 21, 2014 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Facepets.com, LLC. (Martin, Anne)
February 20, 2014 Bar status of Attys Anne C. Martin and Paul W. Kruse of TN verified as active this date. (tmw)
February 20, 2014 3 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/7/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin. (tmw)
February 20, 2014 2 NOTICE from USDC Clerk regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement requirement. (tmw)
February 14, 2014 1 COMPLAINT against Facebook, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400), filed by Facepets.com, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Trademark docs, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Publication, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Correspondence, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Service Mark Principal Register, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Extension Request, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons, # 8 Receipt)(tmw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Facepets.com, LLC v. Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Facepets.com, LLC
Represented By: Anne C. Martin
Represented By: Paul W. Kruse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?