Tsegaye v. The Amalgamated Transit Union, Local 1235
Plaintiff: Fassil Tsegaye
Defendant: The Amalgamated Transit Union, Local 1235
Case Number: 3:2014cv00978
Filed: April 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
Presiding Judge: Juliet E. Griffin
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 9/11/15. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(afs)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/17/2015 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Pretrial Conference set for 11/9/2015 at 1:00 PM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Exhibit List due by 11/2/2015. Witness List due by 11/2/2015. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/2/2015. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 6/27/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ds)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER 1: Motions to Amend due by 2/10/2015. Discovery due by 2/10/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 6/22/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 6/26/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ds)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management. Discovery is not stayed absent order of the District Judge.This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Judge. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 4/15/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tsegaye v. The Amalgamated Transit Union, Local 1235
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fassil Tsegaye
Represented By: Phillip Leon Davidson
Represented By: Lawrence Doyle Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Amalgamated Transit Union, Local 1235
Represented By: C. Dewey Branstetter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?