Wilson, et al v. Gordon, et al
Plaintiff: Melissa Wilson, April Reynolds, Mohammed Mossa, Mayan Said, S.P., K.P., T.V., C.A., D.A., S.V. and S.G.
Defendant: Darin Gordon, Larry B. Martin and Raquel Hatter
Case Number: 3:2014cv01492
Filed: July 23, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: John S. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 286 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 1/28/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 232 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT AND ORDER: Pending before the Court is Defendants' Motion to Decertify the Class and Dismiss theCase. (Doc. No. 164). Defendants' motion has been briefed extensively by both parties, and theMagistrate Judge h eld a hearing on the motion on April 27, 2017. For the reasons discussed below, Defendants' motion is DENIED. For the foregoing reasons, the Court DENIES Defendants' Motion to Decertify the Class and Dismiss the Case. The class definition ( Doc. No. 90) remains unchanged, and the preliminary injunction (Doc. No. 91) remains in effect. The case remains set for a bench trial on October 9, 2018, and absent extraordinary circumstances, no continuances will be granted. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 6/5/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 9/2/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: The Court held a status conference on August 15, 2014. Regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 48 , Plaintiffs shall file a response by September 3, 2014. Defendants shall file a reply by September 22, 2014. Because the parties have co nflicting interpretations about the meaning of various Federal Medicaid statutes and regulations, the parties are ordered to serve the Complaint, pending motions and this Order on the United States Attorney for this District. To the extent the Uni ted States Attorney intends to file any pleading in this action, the pleading shall be filed by August 22, 2014. The Court expresses no opinion at this time on whether the United States is a necessary party to this action. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 8/15/14. (dt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson, et al v. Gordon, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Wilson
Represented By: George Gordon Bonnyman, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Brooke
Represented By: Christopher E. Coleman
Represented By: Elizabeth Edwards
Represented By: Michele M. Johnson
Represented By: James M. Knoepp
Represented By: Jane Perkins
Represented By: Sara Zampierin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Reynolds
Represented By: George Gordon Bonnyman, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Brooke
Represented By: Christopher E. Coleman
Represented By: Elizabeth Edwards
Represented By: Michele M. Johnson
Represented By: James M. Knoepp
Represented By: Jane Perkins
Represented By: Sara Zampierin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammed Mossa
Represented By: George Gordon Bonnyman, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Brooke
Represented By: Christopher E. Coleman
Represented By: Elizabeth Edwards
Represented By: Michele M. Johnson
Represented By: James M. Knoepp
Represented By: Jane Perkins
Represented By: Sara Zampierin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayan Said
Represented By: George Gordon Bonnyman, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Brooke
Represented By: Christopher E. Coleman
Represented By: Elizabeth Edwards
Represented By: Michele M. Johnson
Represented By: James M. Knoepp
Represented By: Jane Perkins
Represented By: Sara Zampierin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.P.
Represented By: George Gordon Bonnyman, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Brooke
Represented By: Christopher E. Coleman
Represented By: Elizabeth Edwards
Represented By: Michele M. Johnson
Represented By: James M. Knoepp
Represented By: Jane Perkins
Represented By: Sara Zampierin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.P.
Represented By: George Gordon Bonnyman, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Brooke
Represented By: Christopher E. Coleman
Represented By: Elizabeth Edwards
Represented By: Michele M. Johnson
Represented By: James M. Knoepp
Represented By: Jane Perkins
Represented By: Sara Zampierin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.V.
Represented By: George Gordon Bonnyman, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Brooke
Represented By: Christopher E. Coleman
Represented By: Elizabeth Edwards
Represented By: Michele M. Johnson
Represented By: James M. Knoepp
Represented By: Jane Perkins
Represented By: Sara Zampierin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.A.
Represented By: George Gordon Bonnyman, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Brooke
Represented By: Christopher E. Coleman
Represented By: Elizabeth Edwards
Represented By: Michele M. Johnson
Represented By: James M. Knoepp
Represented By: Jane Perkins
Represented By: Sara Zampierin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.A.
Represented By: George Gordon Bonnyman, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Brooke
Represented By: Christopher E. Coleman
Represented By: Elizabeth Edwards
Represented By: Michele M. Johnson
Represented By: James M. Knoepp
Represented By: Jane Perkins
Represented By: Sara Zampierin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.V.
Represented By: George Gordon Bonnyman, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Brooke
Represented By: Christopher E. Coleman
Represented By: Elizabeth Edwards
Represented By: Michele M. Johnson
Represented By: James M. Knoepp
Represented By: Jane Perkins
Represented By: Sara Zampierin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.G.
Represented By: George Gordon Bonnyman, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Brooke
Represented By: Christopher E. Coleman
Represented By: Elizabeth Edwards
Represented By: Michele M. Johnson
Represented By: James M. Knoepp
Represented By: Jane Perkins
Represented By: Sara Zampierin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darin Gordon
Represented By: Brian Barnes
Represented By: Leslie Ann Bridges
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Nicole J. Moss
Represented By: Carolyn E. Reed
Represented By: Linda A. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry B. Martin
Represented By: Brian Barnes
Represented By: Leslie Ann Bridges
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Nicole J. Moss
Represented By: Carolyn E. Reed
Represented By: Linda A. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raquel Hatter
Represented By: Brian Barnes
Represented By: Leslie Ann Bridges
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Nicole J. Moss
Represented By: Carolyn E. Reed
Represented By: Linda A. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?