J.H., by next friend Betty Harris v. Williamson County et al
Plaintiff: J.H., by next friend Betty Harris
Defendant: Williamson County, Juan Cruz, Steve McMahon, Betsy Adgent and Sharon Guffee
Case Number: 3:2014cv02356
Filed: December 16, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Williamson
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
Presiding Judge: Juliet E. Griffin
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER & MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT: For all these reasons, Plaintiff's unopposed Motion to Deem Judgment Final and to Stay Remaining Proceedings is GRANTED. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b), the court certifies that its Orders at Docket Nos. 217 and 385 are final judgments as to Defendants Williamson County, McMahan, Adgent and Guffee and that there is no just reason for delay of an appeal. This action is STAYED, pending resolution of Plaintiff's appeal. The pretrial conferen ce set for September 7, 2018 and the jury trial set for September 11, 2018, are canceled. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/24/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER granting 283 Motion to Seal Document. Motion granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 10/26/17. (am)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 216 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/22/17. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 215 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 204 Motion for Reconsideration, or in the alternative, for Interlocutory Appeal. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/18/17. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER granting 172 Motion for Leave to Court to File Reply to Williamson County's Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Review the Denial of Plaintiff's Motion to Amend. Motion GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/23/17. (am)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT & ORDER: For these reasons, the Order of the Magistrate Judge (Docket No. 81) is AFFIRMED, and Defendant Williamson County's Motion for Appointment of a Guardian Ad Litem (Docket No. 70) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/14/16. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 10/17/16. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.H., by next friend Betty Harris v. Williamson County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.H., by next friend Betty Harris
Represented By: Connie Lynn Reguli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williamson County
Represented By: Lisa M. Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betsy Adgent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Guffee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?