Cline et al v. Publix Super Markets, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gary Cline, Sabrina Beth Cline and Stephanie Blankenship
Defendant: Publix Super Markets, Inc. and Publix Tennessee, LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv00275
Filed: March 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/6/2017. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER on Discovery of Witness Statement. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Brown, Joe)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/11/2015. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cline et al v. Publix Super Markets, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Cline
Represented By: Matt Abbott
Represented By: Edmund J. Schmidt, III
Represented By: John M. Tipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Beth Cline
Represented By: Matt Abbott
Represented By: Edmund J. Schmidt, III
Represented By: John M. Tipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Blankenship
Represented By: Matt Abbott
Represented By: Edmund J. Schmidt, III
Represented By: John M. Tipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Publix Super Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Taylor B. Mayes
Represented By: Steven Douglas Parman
Represented By: Andrew D. Tharp
Represented By: John M. Tipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Publix Tennessee, LLC
Represented By: Taylor B. Mayes
Represented By: Steven Douglas Parman
Represented By: Andrew D. Tharp
Represented By: John M. Tipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?