Neal v. Fort
Plaintiff: Will Neal, Jr.
Defendant: John Fort and State Farm -NOT A NAMED PARTY
Case Number: 3:2015cv00425
Filed: April 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: John S. Bryant
Presiding Judge: John T. Nixon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum, the Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket No. 39 ) filed by the defendant, John Fort, and the Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket No. 43 ) filed by the unnamed defendant, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, are DENIED. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/9/2017. (hb)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, the Daubert Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Roman Kickirillo filed by the Plaintiff (Docket No. 36 ) is GRANTED. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/30/2017. (hb)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/20/2017. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neal v. Fort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Will Neal, Jr.
Represented By: Henry S. Queener, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Fort
Represented By: Joseph Bernard Klockenkemper, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm -NOT A NAMED PARTY
Represented By: Joseph Bernard Klockenkemper, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?