Davis v. Hill et al
Plaintiff: Roland Davis
Defendant: Samantha Hill, L.T.P. Denton, Daron Hall, Pamela Hale and Chris Brown
Case Number: 3:2015cv00936
Filed: August 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: John S. Bryant
Presiding Judge: John T. Nixon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER: On February 21, 2017, the Magistrate Judge issued a Report and Recommendation (R&R) (Docket No. 64) as to the defendants' motion to dismiss (Docket No. 29), recommending that the motion be granted, all other pending motions be denied as moot, and this action be dismissed. Pending before the court are Objections to the R&R timely filed by the plaintiff. (Docket No. 66). For the reasons explained more fully in the Memorandum entered contemporaneously herewith, the court finds that the plaintiff's Objections lack merit. The court agrees with the Magistrate Judge's analysis and recommendation and finds that the defendants' motion to dismiss should be granted, all other pending motions be denied as moot, and thi s action be dismissed. Therefore, the plaintiff's Objections are OVERRULED. Accordingly, the R&R entered on February 21, 2017 is hereby ADOPTED AND APPROVED AS MODIFIED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/21/17. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(am)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER: On August 26, 2016, the magistrate judge issued a Report and Recommendation (Docket No. 46), to which the pro se plaintiff has filed timely Objections (Docket No. 53). The plaintiff appears to misunderstand the ruling by the magistrate judge . The magistrate judge is not recommending that the case be dismissed; he is merely analyzing how the plaintiff has not made out proper grounds for the issuance of a preliminary injunction at this phase of the case. This case is not being dismisse d on its merits. For the reasons expressed herein, the Objections of the plaintiff are OVERRULED. The Report and Recommendation is ACCEPTED and made the findings of fact and conclusions of law of this court. For the reasons expressed therein, it is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiff'sMotions for Preliminary Injunction To Be Released Due to Retaliation (Docket Nos. 13, 18) are DENIED. This case shall be returned to the magistrate judge for further handling under the original referral order. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/12/17. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(am)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by Senior Judge John T. Nixon on 8/31/15. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Hill et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roland Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.T.P. Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daron Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?