Lyle v. Montgomery County Jail et al
Plaintiff: Robert Douglas Lyle
Defendant: f/n/u Ison and Montgomery County
Case Number: 3:2015cv01065
Filed: October 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
Presiding Judge: E. Clifton Knowles
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Pending before the Court are two Reports and Recommendations of the Magistrate Judge, to which no timely objections have been filed. (Doc. Nos. 34 - 35 .) The Court has reviewed the Reports and Recommen dations and conducted a de novo review of the record. The Reports and Recommendations are ADOPTED. Accordingly, Montgomery Countys Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. No. 29 ) is GRANTED. Jessica Ison's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. No. [2 6]) is GRANTED. The Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Lyle's Emergency Request to be Moved to T.D.O.C. (Doc. No. 22 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 3/1/2017. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: For the foregoing reasons, the undersigned recommends that Defendant Ison's Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket No. 26 ) be GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 2/8/2017. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 10/14/2015. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lyle v. Montgomery County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Douglas Lyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: f/n/u Ison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?