Baker v. JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.
Plaintiff: Sheri L. Baker
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00124
Filed: February 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
Presiding Judge: Barbara D. Holmes
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Based on the foregoing, the undersigned magistrate judge respectfully RECOMMENDS that Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction (Docket Entry No. 53 ) be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 5/23/2017. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: For the reasons discussed in the accompanying Memorandum, the court OVERRULES the defendant's Objections and ACCEPTS the R&R. Accordingly, the plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended (Doc. No. 34 ) is GRANTED and the defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 19 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The plaintiff's claim under 15 U.S.C. § 1681s-2(a)(8)(E) is DISMISSED, but the plaintiff's claim under 15 U.S.C. § 1681s-2(b) will be permitted to proceed. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the plaintiff's proposed Second Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 34-1) as a separate document. The matter remains referred to the magistrate judge for case manag ement. Neither party objects to the recommendation that the plaintiff's first Motion for Leave (Doc. No. 32 ) be denied. The court therefore ACCEPTS the magistrate judge's recommendation and DENIES that motion.It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/2/2017. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/2/2017. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Presently pending before the Court is the motion to dismiss (Docket Entry No. 19 ) of Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Plaintiff has filed a response in opposition (Docket Entry No. 22 ), as well as two motions for leave to amend her complaint. See Docket Entry Nos. 32 and 34. As set out below, the undersigned Magistrate Judge respectfully recommends that: (i) the motion to dismiss (Docket No. 19 ) be GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; (ii) Plaintiff' s first motion (Docket Entry No. 32 ) for leave to amend be DENIED; and, (iii) Plaintiff's second motion (Docket Entry No. 34) for leave to amend be GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 1/30/2017. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheri L. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.
Represented By: Cassandra L. Crawford
Represented By: James Auman Haltom
Represented By: Mark A. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?