Bishop v. Hamya, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Martin Bishop
Defendant: Hamya, Inc., Husani Hassan and Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County, Tennessee, The
Case Number: 3:2016cv01123
Filed: June 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
Presiding Judge: Barbara D. Holmes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 251 JUDGMENT: The above entitled matter has come before the court on a nonjury trial, and in accordance with the court's memorandum opinion and order setting forth the court's findings of fact and conclusions of law entered on this date, IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that judgment hereby is GRANTED in favor of Defendant The Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County, Tennessee. Signed by Senior Judge George Caram Steeh, III on 11/12/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 207 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT & ORDER: For the reasons set forth above, Defendant Hamya's and Hassan's motions for summary judgment (Doc. 183 and 184) are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Hamya's motion for summary judgment as to the cross-claim filed by Hassan (Doc. 189) is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Senior Judge George Caram Steeh, III on 4/24/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 164 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN GOVERNMENT OF NASHVILLE AND DAVIDSON COUNTY'S SECOND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. 128 ): For the reasons stated in this opinion and order, Defendant Metro's second motion for summary judgment (Doc. 128 ) is DENIED. Signed by Senior Judge George Caram Steeh, III on 8/17/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons set forth above, defendant Metro's motion for partial judgment on the pleadings (Doc. 75 ) is GRANTED and plaintiff's claims under Tenn. Code Ann. Sec. 29-20-203 and 204 are DISMISSED. Plaintiff's cl aims arising out of the negligence of the tow truck driver pursuant to Tenn. Code Ann. Sec. 29-20-202 and 205 remain viable. Signed by Senior Judge George Caram Steeh, III on 8/17/17. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER: The Report and Recommendation 54 is adopted and approved. Accordingly, Defendant Metro's Motion for Summary Judgment 38 isDENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 2/21/17. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bishop v. Hamya, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Bishop
Represented By: Clinton L. Kelly
Represented By: F. Dulin Kelly
Represented By: James B. Moseley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamya, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Husani Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County, Tennessee, The
Represented By: Paul Jeff Campbell, II
Represented By: R. Alex Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?