Gottwald v. Sebert
Plaintiff: Gottwald and Lukasz Gottwald
Defendant: Sebert and Pebe Sebert
Case Number: 3:2016cv02386
Filed: September 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Williamson
Presiding Judge: Joe Brown
Referring Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: The parties have filed a Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice (Doc. No. 49). Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and the Clerk is directed to close the file. Any pending Motions are DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/5/17. (am)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER : Judge Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes no longer assigned to case. On June 23, 2017, the parties filed a joint stipulation of dismissal with prejudice (Docket Entry No. 49). Therefore, the Clerk of Court shall forward this file to the Honorable Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr., Chief Judge, for his consideration of the stipulation of dismissal with prejudice. Unless otherwise ordered by the Court, there will be no further proceedings before the Magistrate Judge and the telephone conference scheduled for August 31, 2017, is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 6/29/17. (am)
June 23, 2017 Filing 49 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Lukasz Gottwald. (Warnock, Timothy)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 8/31/2017 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 6/22/17. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: The undersigned Magistrate Judge conducted an informal mediation with counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant on April 21, 2017. The parties were not able to reach a resolution, but agreed to continue negotiating. To that end, Plaintiff's counsel shall submit to Defendant's counsel a revised settlement offer on or before April 27, 2017. The parties shall notify the Court if they want to engage in further mediation. This matter is returned to Magistrate Judge Holmes for further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 4/21/17. (am)
April 21, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern: Telephone Conference held on 4/21/2017. (tm)
April 14, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern: Telephone Conference held on 4/14/2017 re settlement. (tm)
March 31, 2017 State Bar status verified as active for Maria Q. Campbell. (am)
March 30, 2017 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria Q. Campbell on behalf of Pebe Sebert (Campbell, Maria)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: Dispositive Motions due by 6/21/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 3/17/17. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
March 17, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern: Telephone Conference held on 3/17/2017 re settlement conference dates. (tm)
March 16, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes: Telephone Conference held on 3/16/2017; ORDER to enter. (Tape #not recorded.) (jwc)
March 14, 2017 Filing 44 Joint Case Resolution Status Report by Lukasz Gottwald. (Warnock, Timothy) Modified Text on 3/16/2017 (am).
February 9, 2017 Filing 43 SUBPOENA issued to Mondrian Hotel Los Angeles and returned executed on February 2, 2017 as to Mondrian Hotel Los Angeles by Pebe Sebert (Bellamy, Raquel)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER: On January 20, 2017, the parties filed a Joint Case Resolution Status Report, which requested a judicial settlement conference with Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. After consultation with Judge Newbern, she is available for a judicial settlement conference in late March or April as generally requested by the parties. This case is therefore REFERRED to Judge Newbern for a settlement conference. Counsel for the parties shall contact Ms. Tina McDonald, Courtroom Deputy, to obtain an available date on Judge Newbern's calendar. Judge Newbern will issue a separate order detailing her settlement conference procedures and requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 2/7/2017. (jw)
January 20, 2017 Filing 41 STATUS REPORT : JOINT CASE RESOLUTION STATUS REPORT by Lukasz Gottwald. (Warnock, Timothy)
January 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER finding as moot #38 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiffs filed a response by the originally-scheduled deadline of January 9, 2017, and the motion is therefore DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 01/15/2017. (Holmes, Barbara)
January 9, 2017 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Bifurcate Count II and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Lukasz Gottwald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - June 2016 Email Exchange)(Warnock, Timothy)
January 6, 2017 Filing 38 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion to Bifurcate (Unopposed) by Lukasz Gottwald. (Warnock, Timothy)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Motion to Clarify. The briefing schedule for Defendant's motion to bifurcate/sever claims provided for in the Order entered in Case No. 3:14-2039 at Docket No. 139 shall apply to Defendant's motion filed in this case #31 . Response by January 9, 2017 and optional reply by January 16, 2017 with page limitations as provided. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 12/22/2016. (Holmes, Barbara)
December 20, 2016 Filing 36 MOTION to Clarify re #28 Case Management Order, #31 MOTION to Bifurcate Count II and Supporting Memorandum of Law And To Set Deadline For Plaintiffs To Respond To Defendants' Motion to Bifurcate by Lukasz Gottwald. (Warnock, Timothy)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: On December 6, 2016, the parties filed a Joint Case Resolution Plan (Docket No. 32), which generally describes the parties' proposed attempts at case resolution, but does not provide sufficient detail of the timing of case resolution status reports. Accordingly, the parties shall file a joint case resolution status report by no later than January 20, 2017, and a second joint report by no later than March 14, 2017. Each joint status report shall confirm the parties' efforts at case resolution and shall also state whether the parties believe that any of the ADR options available in the Court's local rules might assist in resolution. If the parties request a judicial settlement conference, the joint report shall also state the parties' proposed timing for scheduling of a settlement conference and any preference of the parties for a particular Magistrate Judge to conduct the settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 12/9/16. (am)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: Jury Trial set for 10/17/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom A859 before District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 10/2/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom A859 before District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw Jr. Exhibit List due by 9/25/2017. Witness List due by 9/25/2017. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/25/2017. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 12/9/16. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
December 6, 2016 Filing 33 JOINT Statement OF RESPECTIVE THEORIES. (Warnock, Timothy)
December 6, 2016 Filing 32 JOINT Statement (CASE RESOLUTION PLAN). (Warnock, Timothy)
December 6, 2016 Filing 31 MOTION to Bifurcate Count II and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Pebe Sebert. (Attachments: #1 Attachment ScanDisck Corp v. STMicroelectronic Inc.)(Little, J.)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER finding as moot #27 The parties' joint motion for entry of a revised case management order was rendered moot by entry of the Initial Case Management Order #28 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 12/05/2016. (Holmes, Barbara)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 12/6/2016 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. Plaintiffs' counsel shall initiate the call. By no later than 2:00 p.m. (Central) on December 6, the parties shall file a joint statement of the issues for discussion, which may include issues resulting from the December 5 status conference in the New York Litigation or any other case management issues. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 12/1/16. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Motions To Amend due by 3/3/2017. Discovery due by 3/15/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 6/2/2017. Telephone Conference set for 3/16/2017 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 11/30/16. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
November 16, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes: Case Management Conference held on 11/16/2016. in conjunction with case management conference in 3:14-2039; ORDER to enter (Tape #digital recording.) (jwc)
November 14, 2016 Filing 27 Joint MOTION requesting the Court to enter a revised Case Management Order Supplemental Joint Motion for Entry of a Revised Proposed Case Management Order by Pebe Sebert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plntf's Proposed Deadlines, #2 Exhibit Deft's Proposed Deadlines)(Little, J.)
November 10, 2016 Filing 26 (DISREGARD FILED IN ERROR, ATTORNEY TO REFILE CORRECT DOCUMENT)SUPPLEMENT filed by Pebe Sebert re #22 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Proposed Deadlines, # 2 Exhibit Defendant's Proposed Deadlines)(Little, J.) Modified on 11/23/2016 (am).
November 2, 2016 Filing 25 ANSWER to #23 Amended Complaint by Pebe Sebert.(Little, J.)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Motion Reschedule The Case Management Conference. The Joint motion of the parties to reschedule the case management conference from November 8, 2016, to November 16, 2016, is GRANTED. (Docket Entry No. 22). The case management conference is hereby RESCHEDULED for 3:00 p.m., Wednesday, November 16, 2016, in Courtroom No. 764, U.S. Courthouse, 801 Broadway. The other case involving these same parties will also be rescheduled, and a separate order will enter in that case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 10/19/16. (am)
October 19, 2016 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Pebe Sebert, filed by Lukasz Gottwald.(Warnock, Timothy)
October 12, 2016 Filing 22 Joint MOTION to Reschedule Concurrently Set Case Management Conferences re #8 Order, Set Hearings by Lukasz Gottwald. (Warnock, Timothy)
September 30, 2016 BAR STATUS FOR ATTORNEYS J. ALEX LITTLE, AMANDA S. FLOYD, AND RAQUEL L. BELLAMY OF TN VERIFIED ACTIVE ON THIS DATE. (am)
September 29, 2016 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Raquel L. Bellamy on behalf of Pebe Sebert (Bellamy, Raquel)
September 29, 2016 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda S. Floyd on behalf of Pebe Sebert (Floyd, Amanda)
September 29, 2016 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Pebe Sebert.(Little, J.)
September 29, 2016 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Alex Little on behalf of Pebe Sebert (Little, J.)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Gabriella Nourafchan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion, DE15, is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 9/29/16. (am)
September 29, 2016 BAR STATUS FOR ATTORNEY GABRIELLA NOURAFCHAN OF CA VERIFIED ACTIVE ON THIS DATE. (am)
September 28, 2016 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Gabriella Nourafchan from the United States District Court for the Central of California filed by Lukasz Gottwald. (Warnock, Timothy)
September 28, 2016 Filing 15 MOTION for attorney(s) Gabriella Nourafchan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2291797) by Lukasz Gottwald. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Warnock, Timothy)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Christine Lepera to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion, DE9, is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 9/23/16. (am)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Jeffrey M. Movit to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion, DE11, is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 9/23/16. (am)
September 23, 2016 BAR STATUS FOR ATTORNEY JEFFREY M. MOVIT OF NY VERIFIED ACTIVE ON THIS DATE. (am)
September 23, 2016 **DISREGARD-ENTERED IN WRONG CASE**Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes: Case Management Conference held on 9/23/2016; ORDER to enter. (Tape #digital recording.) (jwc) Modified on 10/18/2016 (af).
September 22, 2016 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Jeffrey M. Movit from the United States District Court for the Southern of New York filed by Lukasz Gottwald. (Warnock, Timothy)
September 22, 2016 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney(s) Jeffrey M. Movit to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2289203) by Lukasz Gottwald. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Warnock, Timothy)
September 22, 2016 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Christine Lepera from the United States District Court for the Southern of New York filed by Lukasz Gottwald. (Warnock, Timothy)
September 20, 2016 NOTICE TO COUNSEL (Christine Lepera) : WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $75.00 (LR 83.01(d)). (am)
September 19, 2016 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney(s) Christine Lepera to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2286839) by Lukasz Gottwald. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Warnock, Timothy)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Initial Case Management Conference is reset for 11/8/2016 at 03:00 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 9/16/16. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Pursuant to Administrative Order 176, the Clerk is directed to reassign this case at the Magistrate Judge level to Magistrate Judge Holmes as it is related to pending civil action 3:14-cv-2039. This case remains assigned to District Judge Crenshaw. Any deadlines previously set by the Court will remain in effect, unless changed by Magistrate Judge Holmes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 9/15/16. (am)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. The parties shall develop a plan for resolution of the case that includes at least two independent attempts to resolve the case. The first attempt shall occur within 90 days of the initial case management conference and the second attempt shall occur before the deadline for filing dispositive motions. The parties are encouraged to consider the Alternative Dispute Resolution options provided in Local Rule 16.02 through 16.07. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Judge in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(d)(5). Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 9/13/16. (am)
September 9, 2016 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed by Lukasz Gottwald. Pebe Sebert served on 9/8/2016. (Warnock, Timothy)
September 8, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/29/2016 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. (am)
September 8, 2016 Filing 3 Summons issued as to Pebe Sebert. (Summons to be picked up by Attorney.) (am)
September 8, 2016 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
September 8, 2016 BAR STATUS FOR ATTORNEYS TIMOTHY L. WARNOCK & ELIZABETH O. GONSER OF TN VERIFIED ACTIVE ON THIS DATE. (am)
September 8, 2016 NOTICE TO COUNSEL (Christine Lepra & Jeffrey M. Movit) : WITHIN 20 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $75.00 (LR 83.01(d)) (am)
September 7, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pebe Sebert (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2278619), filed by Lukasz Gottwald. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gottwald v. Sebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gottwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lukasz Gottwald
Represented By: Christine Lepera
Represented By: Timothy L. Warnock
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Movit
Represented By: Gabriella Nourafchan
Represented By: Elizabeth O. Gonser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pebe Sebert
Represented By: Amanda S. Floyd
Represented By: J. Alex Little
Represented By: Maria Q. Campbell
Represented By: Raquel L. Bellamy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?