Gentry v. Tennessee Board of Judicial Conduct, The et al
Plaintiff: John Anthony Gentry
Defendant: Tennessee Board of Judicial Conduct, The, Chris Craft, Timothy R. Discenza, Unnamed Members of Investigative Panel, Unnamed Liability Insurance Carrier(s) and State of Tennessee, The
Case Number: 3:2017cv00020
Filed: January 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Barbara D. Holmes
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER: The court therefore ACCEPTS and ADOPTS in its entirety the magistrate judge's R&R 116 and DENIES the plaintiff's Emergency Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants Pamela Anderson Taylor and Brenton Hall Lankford 86 . Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/13/17. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Having conducted a de novo review of the TRO Motion in light of the plaintiff's Objections to the R&R, the court OVERRULES the Objections and DENIES the TRO Motion (Doc. No. 19 ). The matter remains referred to the magistrate judge. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/18/2017. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Based on the foregoing, the undersigned Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction (Docket Entry No. 19) be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 6/5/2017. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The plaintiff has not argued that newly discovered evidence or an intervening change in controlling law would merit the granting of his motion. For these reasons, the plaintiff's Motion to Alter May 15, 2017 Order Denying Leave to Amend (Docket No. 61 ) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/31/2017. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gentry v. Tennessee Board of Judicial Conduct, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Anthony Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Board of Judicial Conduct, The
Represented By: Stephanie A. Bergmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Craft
Represented By: Stephanie A. Bergmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy R. Discenza
Represented By: Stephanie A. Bergmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unnamed Members of Investigative Panel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unnamed Liability Insurance Carrier(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Tennessee, The
Represented By: Stephanie A. Bergmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?