Gore v. Core Civic Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mark Gore
Defendant: Core Civic Inc., (f/n/u) Rychen, Darrell Jones, (f/n/u) Hebron, (f/n/u) Carter, (f/n/u) Sowers, (f/n/u) Andrews and Jane Doe
Case Number: 3:2017cv01082
Filed: July 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S. Frensley
Presiding Judge: Waverly D. Crenshaw
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER: After a de novo review of the record, the Court agrees that the Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment should be granted and the action dismissed with prejudice, and therefore the Report and Recommendation (Doc. No. 88) is ADOPTED. Ac cordingly, Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. No. 70) is GRANTED. The instant action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 11/6/2018. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) Modified Date on 11/7/2018 (am).
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 70 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Core Civic Inc., Desiree Andrews, Darrell Jones, (f/n/u) Sowers, (f/n/u) Hebron, (f/n/u) Rychen, (f/n/u) Carter. The undersigned therefore recommends that Defendants&# 039; Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket No. 70) be GRANTED, and that this action be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The undersigned further recommends that because the medical evidence in this case is filed under Seal, this Report and Recommendation should also be filed under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 10/22/2018. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER AND MEMORANDUM: The Plaintiff's motion to alter or amend ( 7 ) is hereby GRANTED. The Court's August 11, 2017 dismissal of the Plaintiff's § 1983 claim against Jane Doe based on statute of limitations grounds is hereby VACAT ED, as is the Court's dismissal of the Plaintiff's § 1983 claim against Defendant f/n/u Andrews based on failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. The Plaintiff is hereby GRANTED leave to file an amended complaint rega rding his § 1983 claims against Defendants Jane Doe and Andrews. The Plaintiff's amended complaint must be filed within 14 days of receiving this Order or the amended complaint will not be considered by the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 11/27/17. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/11/2017. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ab)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gore v. Core Civic Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Core Civic Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (f/n/u) Rychen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (f/n/u) Hebron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (f/n/u) Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (f/n/u) Sowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (f/n/u) Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?