Griffin et al v. Medtronic, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Amy Turner Griffin and Kai Garrett Griffin
Defendant: Medtronic, Inc., Medtronic PLC, Covidien PLC and Covidien LP
Case Number: 3:2018cv00069
Filed: January 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Williamson
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
2 Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2019 Filing 54 ENTRY OF JUDGMENT re: #53 Order Dismissing Case. (gb)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER: The parties have filed a Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice ( #52 ). The Stipulation of Dismissal sufficed to dismiss this action without any action on the part of the Court. Because the parties have stated that the dismissal is with prejudice, the dismissal in fact is with prejudice. Accordingly, the Court acknowledges that all claims in this action have been DISMISSED with prejudice, and the Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 5/16/19. (gb)
May 15, 2019 Filing 52 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Covidien LP, Medtronic, Inc. (Pratt, Bryan) Modified on 5/16/2019 (gb).
January 7, 2019 Filing 51 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Covidien LP, Medtronic, Inc. (gb)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Medtronic's motion to amend its answer ( #35 ) and motion to amend the scheduling order ( #47 ) are GRANTED. Any additional motions to amend or to add parties shall be filed by January 28, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 1/7/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (gb)
January 7, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern: Telephone Conference held on 1/7/2019. (tm)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The Griffins' motion to strike ( #32 ) is DENIED as to Medtronic's eleventh, twelfth, and thirteenth affirmative defenses and FOUND MOOT as to its withdrawn fifteenth and sixteenth affirmative defenses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 11/26/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: Pursuant to the division of the docket, this case is transferred to Judge Eli J. Richardson. All previously imposed deadlines and Court dates remain unchanged, pending any further order from Judge Richardson. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/22/18. (gb)
October 12, 2018 Filing 47 MOTION To Extend the Deadline to File a Motion to Amend or to Add Parties by Covidien LP, Medtronic, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Kimerling, Whitney)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: This Court, having considered Medtronic, Inc.'s and Covidien LP's Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline to File a Motion to Amend or to Add Parties, finds that it should be GRANTED. It is accordingly, ORDERED that Medtronic, Inc. and Covidien LP have until and including October 14, 2018, to file a motion to amend or to add parties. All deadlines of this Court's prior case management orders remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 8/22/18. (gb) Modified text on 8/27/2018 (gb).
August 22, 2018 Filing 45 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Motion to Amend or to Add Parties by Covidien LP, Medtronic, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Kimerling, Whitney)
August 17, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE by Covidien LP, Medtronic, Inc. of Intent to Serve Amended Subpoena (Kimerling, Whitney)
August 7, 2018 Filing 43 JOINT Statement Report Concerning ADR Efforts. (Kimerling, Whitney)
July 27, 2018 Filing 42 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #32 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Affirmative Defenses filed by Covidien LP, Medtronic, Inc. (gb)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply re #32 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 7/27/18. (gb)
July 25, 2018 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply re #32 Motion to Strike by Covidien LP, Medtronic, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sur-Reply)(Kimerling, Whitney) Modified text on 7/25/2018 (gb).
July 11, 2018 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to Motion re #32 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Affirmative Defenses filed by Amy Turner Griffin, Kai Garrett Griffin. (gb)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Leave to File Reply to Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 7/11/18. (gb)
July 10, 2018 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 MOTION to Amend/Correct Their Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Amy Turner Griffin, Kai Garrett Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - DeBakker v. Hanger Prosthetics)(Clayton, Daniel)
July 9, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to to File Reply to Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike re #34 Response to Motion by Amy Turner Griffin, Kai Garrett Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Reply)(Clayton, Daniel)
July 5, 2018 Filing 35 MOTION to Amend/Correct Their Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Covidien LP, Medtronic, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Answer, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Kimerling, Whitney)
July 3, 2018 Filing 34 RESPONSE to Motion re #32 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Affirmative Defenses in the Answer of Medtronic, Inc. and Covidien LP filed by Covidien LP, Medtronic, Inc. (Kimerling, Whitney)
June 19, 2018 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in Support of #32 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Affirmative Defenses filed by Amy Turner Griffin, Kai Garrett Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendants' Initial Disclosures)(Clayton, Daniel)
June 19, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Affirmative Defenses by Amy Turner Griffin, Kai Garrett Griffin. (Clayton, Daniel)
June 4, 2018 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Covidien LP, Medtronic, Inc. (Kimerling, Whitney)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 5/14/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: Jury Trial set for 2/18/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom A859 before Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw Jr. Exhibit List due by 2/3/2020. Witness List due by 2/3/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 2/10/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A859 before Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw Jr. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/3/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 4/24/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 9/14/2018. Discovery due by 2/14/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 9/9/2019. Telephone Conference set for 1/7/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 4/18/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
April 18, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern: Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/18/2018. (tm)
March 28, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference RESET for 4/18/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (gb)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Continue. The Initial Case Management Conference is RESET for April 18, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair E. Newbern. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 3/28/18. (gb)
March 27, 2018 Filing 26 Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Covidien LP, Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Kimerling, Whitney)
March 23, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Hearing: Case Management Conference RESET for 4/4/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (gb)
March 20, 2018 Filing 24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Submitted by All Parties filed by Amy Turner Griffin, Kai Garrett Griffin. (Teitenberg, Jonathan)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: The parties have filed a Stipulation of Dismissal ( #22 ) in regard to defendants MedTronic PLC and Covidien PLC. Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED without prejudice against MedTronic PLC and Covidien PLC. Claims against the remaining defendants are still pending. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 3/6/18. (gb)
March 2, 2018 Filing 22 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Covidien LP, Covidien PLC, Medtronic PLC, Medtronic, Inc.. (Kimerling, Whitney)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Bryan Pratt to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 2/28/18. (gb)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Laura B. Lawson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 2/28/18. (gb)
February 27, 2018 Filing 19 RECEIPT #34675049362 in the amount of $75 re #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (gb)
February 27, 2018 Filing 18 RECEIPT #34675049363 in the amount of $75 re #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (gb)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 2/21/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Medtronic PLC and Covidien PLC have until and including March 2, 2018 to file any required responsive pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 2/20/18. (gb)
February 20, 2018 NOTE TO FILER re: DE #15 . This document has been scanned. Documents generated from a word processor (Word of WordPerfect) should NOT be scanned, but rather printed directly to PDF via a PDF writer. Document must be text searchable. You do not have to refile this document, however, future scanned pleadings of this nature may require refiling. (gb)
February 20, 2018 MO State Bar status verified as active for Laura Lawson and Bryan Pratt. (gb)
February 16, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading and Limited Notice of Appearance by Covidien PLC, Medtronic PLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Kimerling, Whitney)
February 16, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for attorney(s) Laura B. Lawson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Covidien LP, Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Kimerling, Whitney)
February 16, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for attorney(s) Bryan Pratt to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Covidien LP, Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Kimerling, Whitney)
February 9, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Amy Turner Griffin, Kai Garrett Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Westfield Ins. Co. v. Broan-Nutone, #2 Exhibit B - Westfield complaint)(Clayton, Daniel)
February 9, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jonathan Frederick Teitenberg. (gb)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr recused. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 2/9/18. (gb)
February 8, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Frederick Teitenberg on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Teitenberg, Jonathan)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: On January 26, 2018, Defendants Medtronic, Inc. and Covidien LP filed a motion to dismiss. ( #5 ) Pursuant to Local Rule 7.01(b), any response is to be filed within 14 days after service of the motion. No reply shall be filed without leave of Court. Any filings made related to the motion to dismiss, including motions for extensions of time or to exceed page limits, shall be decided by Judge Campbell unless referred to the undersigned magistrate judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 1/29/18. (gb)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. It is accordingly, ORDERED that Medtronic PLC and Covidien PLC have until and including February 16, 2018, to file any required responsive pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 1/29/18. (gb)
January 26, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading and Limited Notice of Appearance by Covidien PLC, Medtronic PLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Kimerling, Whitney)
January 26, 2018 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Covidien LP, Medtronic, Inc. . (Kimerling, Whitney)
January 26, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Covidien LP, Medtronic, Inc.. (Kimerling, Whitney)
January 23, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/26/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 776 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (gb)
January 23, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for J. Randolph Bibb, Jr, Whitney H. Kimerling, Daniel L. Clayton and Mary Ellen Morris. (gb)
January 23, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (gb)
January 23, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb)
January 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Covidien LP and Medtronic, Inc. from Davidson County Circuit Court, case number 17C3142. (Filing fee paid $400 receipt number 0650-2594188) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Notice to Court of Filing of Removal, #3 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin et al v. Medtronic, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic, Inc.
Represented By: Whitney H. Kimerling
Represented By: J. Randolph Bibb, Jr.
Represented By: Laura Lawson
Represented By: Bryan Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic PLC
Represented By: Whitney H. Kimerling
Represented By: J. Randolph Bibb, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covidien PLC
Represented By: Whitney H. Kimerling
Represented By: J. Randolph Bibb, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covidien LP
Represented By: Whitney H. Kimerling
Represented By: J. Randolph Bibb, Jr.
Represented By: Laura Lawson
Represented By: Bryan Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Turner Griffin
Represented By: Daniel L. Clayton
Represented By: Mary Ellen Morris
Represented By: Jonathan Frederick Teitenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kai Garrett Griffin
Represented By: Daniel L. Clayton
Represented By: Mary Ellen Morris
Represented By: Jonathan Frederick Teitenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?