Norman v. Nissan North America, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Patricia Weckwerth, Sophia Wescott and Cheyne Norman
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc. and Nissan Motor Company, Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00588
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Williamson
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
2 Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2018 Filing 45 MOTION for attorney S. Vance Wittie to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2738919) by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Presnell, E.) Modified on 8/24/2018 (dt).
August 24, 2018 Filing 44 MOTION for attorney(s) E. Paul Cauley, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2738894) by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Presnell, E.)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: In accordance with the Joint Motion #42 of Plaintiffs and Defendant Nissan North America, Inc., the Case Management Conference originally set for September 10, 2018 is hereby RESET for September 27, 2018 at 10:30 a.m. local time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 8/22/2018. (mg) Modified text on 8/22/2018 (mg).
August 22, 2018 Filing 42 Joint MOTION Case Management Conference re #41 Notice of Hearing, by Cheyne Norman, Patricia Weckwerth, Sophia Wescott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Taylor, Caroline)
August 16, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Case Management Conference is set for 9/10/2018 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. Counsel shall submit a proposed initial case management order three (3) business days prior to the conference. Tina S. McDonald, Deputy Clerk. (mg)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Newbern for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(d)(5). Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/15/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 176, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is TRANSFERRED to Judge William L. Campbell, Jr., as it is related to an earlier-filed case assigned to him. The initial case management conference scheduled before Judge Trauger on September 10, 2018 is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/14/2018. (mg)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: In accordance with the Joint Motion #37 of Plaintiffs and Defendant Nissan North America, Inc. ("NNA"), the Court extends the time for NNA to respond to the Complaint for thirty (30) days until August 29, 2018. At the Parties' request, the Initial Case Management Conference is hereby RESET for September 10, 2018 at 3:15 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/1/2018. (mg)
August 1, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for E. Todd Presnell. (mg)
July 31, 2018 Filing 37 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Presnell, E.)
July 27, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by E. Todd Presnell on behalf of Nissan North America, Inc. (Presnell, E.)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Jennifer S. Goldstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/25/2018. (mg)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Gary E. Mason to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/25/2018. (mg)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Tarek H. Zohdy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/24/2018. (mg)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Cody R. Padgett to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/24/2018. (mg)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Trisha K. Monesi to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/24/2018. (mg)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Jordan L. Lurie to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/24/2018. (mg)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Robert K. Friedl to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/24/2018. (mg)
July 24, 2018 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Jennifer S. Goldstein from the United States District Court for the District of Columbia of DC filed by Cheyne Norman, Patricia Weckwerth, Sophia Wescott. (Taylor, Caroline)
July 24, 2018 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Gary E. Mason from the United States District Court for the District of Columbia of DC filed by Cheyne Norman, Patricia Weckwerth, Sophia Wescott. (Taylor, Caroline)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #17 Motion for John C. Whitfield to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/17/2018. (mg)
July 18, 2018 CA State Bar status verified as active for Robert K. Friedl, Trisha K. Monesi, Jordan L. Lurie, Tarek H. Zohdy, and Cody R. Padgett. (mg)
July 17, 2018 Filing 25 RECEIPT #s 34675051139, 34675051140, 34675051141, 34675051142, 34675051143 in the amount of $500 posted by Cheyne Norman, Patricia Weckwerth, Sophia Wescott re #22 Trisha K. Monesi Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #20 Robert K. Friedl Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #21 Jordan L. Lurie Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #23 Cody R. Padgett Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #24 Tarek H. Zohdy Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (mg)
July 17, 2018 D.C. State Bar status verified as active for Gary E. Mason, and Jennifer Goldstein. (mg)
July 17, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Gary E. Mason, and Jennifer Goldstein: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted (LR 83.01(d)). Due by 8/7/2018. (mg) Modified text on 7/17/2018 (mg).
July 17, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for John C. Whitfield. (mg)
July 16, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION for attorney Tarek H. Zohdy to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee Paid) by Cheyne Norman, Patricia Weckwerth, Sophia Wescott. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(mg) Modified text on 7/18/2018 (mg).
July 16, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION for attorney Cody R. Padgett to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee Paid) by Cheyne Norman, Patricia Weckwerth, Sophia Wescott. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(mg) Modified text on 7/17/2018 (mg). Modified text on 7/18/2018 (mg).
July 16, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION for attorney Trisha K. Monesi to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee Paid) by Cheyne Norman, Patricia Weckwerth, Sophia Wescott. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(mg) Modified text on 7/18/2018 (mg).
July 16, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for attorney Jordan L. Lurie to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee Paid) by Cheyne Norman, Patricia Weckwerth, Sophia Wescott. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(mg) Modified text on 7/18/2018 (mg).
July 16, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for attorney(s) Robert K. Friedl to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee Paid) by Cheyne Norman, Patricia Weckwerth, Sophia Wescott. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(mg) Modified text on 7/18/2018 (mg).
July 16, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for attorney(s) Jennifer S. Goldstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2710347) by Cheyne Norman, Patricia Weckwerth, Sophia Wescott. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Taylor, Caroline)
July 16, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for attorney(s) Gary E. Mason to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2710336) by Cheyne Norman, Patricia Weckwerth, Sophia Wescott. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Taylor, Caroline)
July 16, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for attorney(s) John C. Whitfield to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2710324) by Cheyne Norman, Patricia Weckwerth, Sophia Wescott. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Taylor, Caroline)
July 16, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS returned executed by Cheyne Norman, Patricia Weckwerth, Sophia Wescott. Nissan North America, Inc. served on 7/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons in a Civil Action)(Taylor, Caroline)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Russell D. Paul to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/5/2018. (mg)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Jeffrey L. Osterwise to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/5/2018. (mg)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Lawrence Deutsch to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/5/2018. (mg)
July 5, 2018 Filing 12 RECEIPT #34675050981 in the amount of $300.00 posted by Cheyne Norman, Patricia Weckwerth, Sophia Wescott re #11 Russell D. Paul Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #10 Jeffrey L. Osterwise Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, and #9 Lawrence Deutsch Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (mg)
July 2, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney(s) Russell D. Paul to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Cheyne Norman, Patricia Weckwerth, Sophia Wescott. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Paul, Russell)
July 2, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney(s) Jeffrey L. Osterwise to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Cheyne Norman, Patricia Weckwerth, Sophia Wescott. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Osterwise, Jeffrey)
July 2, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney(s) Lawrence Deutsch to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Cheyne Norman, Patricia Weckwerth, Sophia Wescott. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Deutsch, Lawrence)
June 27, 2018 Filing 8 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cheyne Norman, Patricia Weckwerth, Sophia Wescott. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Service)(Taylor, Caroline)
June 27, 2018 Filing 7 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cheyne Norman, Patricia Weckwerth, Sophia Wescott. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Service)(Taylor, Caroline)
June 27, 2018 Filing 6 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cheyne Norman, Patricia Weckwerth, Sophia Wescott. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Service)(Taylor, Caroline)
June 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/27/2018 at 3:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (mg)
June 27, 2018 D.C. State Bar status verified as active for Gary E. Mason, and Jennifer Goldstein. (mg)
June 27, 2018 CA State Bar status verified as active for Robert K. Friedl, Trisha K. Monesi, Jordan L. Lurie, Tarek H. Zohdy, and Cody R. Padgett. (mg)
June 27, 2018 PA State Bar status verified as active for Russell D. Paul, Lawrence Deutsch, and Jeffrey L. Osterwise. (mg)
June 27, 2018 KY State Bar status verified as active for John C. Whitfield. (mg)
June 27, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Robert K. Friedl, Trisha K. Monesi, Gary E. Mason, Jennifer Goldstein, John C. Whitfield, Russell D. Paul, Lawrence Deutsch, Jeffrey L. Osterwise, Jordan L. Lurie, Tarek H. Zohdy, Cody R. Padgett: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(d)). PHV due by 7/18/2018. (mg)
June 27, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Caroline R. Taylor. (mg)
June 27, 2018 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Nissan Motor Company, Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
June 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
June 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nissan Motor Company, Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2697998), filed by Cheyne Norman, Patricia Weckwerth, Sophia Wescott.(mg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/27/2018: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet) (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norman v. Nissan North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Weckwerth
Represented By: Caroline R. Taylor
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Represented By: Jordan L. Lurie
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: Gary E. Mason
Represented By: John C. Whitfield
Represented By: Jennifer Goldstein
Represented By: Trisha K. Monesi
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Osterwise
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Robert K. Friedl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophia Wescott
Represented By: Caroline R. Taylor
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Represented By: Jordan L. Lurie
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: Gary E. Mason
Represented By: John C. Whitfield
Represented By: Jennifer Goldstein
Represented By: Trisha K. Monesi
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Osterwise
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Robert K. Friedl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheyne Norman
Represented By: Caroline R. Taylor
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Represented By: Jordan L. Lurie
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: Gary E. Mason
Represented By: John C. Whitfield
Represented By: Jennifer Goldstein
Represented By: Trisha K. Monesi
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Osterwise
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Robert K. Friedl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By: E. Todd Presnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motor Company, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?