Zander Group Holdings Inc. et al v. Katz, Sapper & Miller LLP et al

Plaintiff: Jeffrey J. Zander and Zander Group Holdings Inc.
Defendant: Katz, Sapper & Miller LLP, KSM Business Services Inc. and Andrew J. Manchir
Case Number: 3:2018cv00653
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
0 Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
1 Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Filing 13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint by KSM Business Services Inc., Katz, Sapper & Miller LLP, Andrew J. Manchir. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Attachment Certificate of Consultation, #3 Attachment Proposed Order)(Glassman, Richard)
September 7, 2018 Filing 12 Sealed Document Confidential Settlement Agreement and Release filed by KSM Business Services Inc., Katz, Sapper & Miller LLP, Andrew J. Manchir. (Glassman, Richard)
September 7, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by KSM Business Services Inc., Katz, Sapper & Miller LLP, Andrew J. Manchir. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Attachment Certificate of Consultation)(Glassman, Richard)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Defendants' #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 8/13/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
August 13, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Richard Glassman. (mg)
August 10, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint by KSM Business Services Inc., Katz, Sapper & Miller LLP, Andrew J. Manchir. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Attachment Certificate of Consultation, #3 Attachment Proposed Order)(Glassman, Richard)
August 10, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Glassman on behalf of All Defendants (Glassman, Richard)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(d)(5). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/18/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
July 18, 2018 Filing 6 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Zander Group Holdings Inc.. (Krog, Paul)
July 17, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 776 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (mg)
July 17, 2018 Filing 4 Summons issued as to KSM Business Services Inc., Katz, Sapper & Miller LLP, Andrew J. Manchir. Service copies will be picked up by counsel. (mg)
July 17, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Eugene N. Bulso, Jr, and Paul J. Krog. (mg)
July 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
July 17, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KSM Business Services Inc., Katz, Sapper & Miller LLP, Andrew J. Manchir (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2710288), filed by Zander Group Holdings Inc., Jeffrey J. Zander. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Acosta v. Zander Group Holdings Inc. Complaint, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zander Group Holdings Inc. et al v. Katz, Sapper & Miller LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katz, Sapper & Miller LLP
Represented By: Richard Glassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KSM Business Services Inc.
Represented By: Richard Glassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew J. Manchir
Represented By: Richard Glassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey J. Zander
Represented By: Eugene N. Bulso, Jr.
Represented By: Paul J. Krog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zander Group Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Eugene N. Bulso, Jr.
Represented By: Paul J. Krog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?