Norris v. Murfreesboro Leased Housing Associates et al
Plaintiff: April Tenille Norris
Defendant: Chariot Pointe Apartments, Murfreesboro Housing Authority, Volunteer Behavioral Health System, Murfreesboro Leased Housing Associates, Mental Health Cooperative, Murfreesboro Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP, Dominium Management Services, Murfreesboro, City of and Rutherford County Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 3:2018cv00750
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Rutherford
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Angelita E. Fisher. (jm)
September 25, 2018 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support of #15 MOTION to Dismiss Based on Res Judicata filed by Murfreesboro Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit July 10, 2017 Lawsuit, #2 Exhibit General Sessions Appeal, #3 Exhibit Norris Response to Answer in Circuit Court)(Fisher, Angelita)
September 25, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Based on Res Judicata by Murfreesboro Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP. (Fisher, Angelita)
September 25, 2018 Filing 14 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Murfreesboro Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP. (Fisher, Angelita)
September 25, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Angelita E. Fisher on behalf of Murfreesboro Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP (Fisher, Angelita)
September 12, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of facts in support of request for counsel by April Tenille Norris re #9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. (jm)
August 30, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by April Tenille Norris. (address updated) (dt)
August 17, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Murfreesboro Housing Authority, Murfreesboro Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP, Volunteer Behavioral Health System, Dominium Management Services, Murfreesboro, City of, Rutherford County Sheriff's Department, Mental Health Cooperative, filed by April Tenille Norris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 35)(dt)
August 17, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by April Tenille Norris. (dt)
August 16, 2018 Filing 8 Summons issued as to Murfreesboro Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP. (Forwarded to USM for service.)(dt)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs #2 is GRANTED, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to file the Complaint in forma pauperis. The claims against Dominium Management Services, Murfreesboro Housing Authority, and Volunteer Behavioral Health System are DISMISSED for failure to state a claim for which relief may be granted. All claims against Murfreesboro Leased Housing Associates I, LLP, doing business as Chariot Point Apartments are DISMISSED except Plaintiff's claim of discrimination in violation of the Fair Housing Act. The Fair Housing Act discrimination claim will be allowed to proceed. The dismissal of the remaining claims against this defendant is without prejudice to Plaintiff's ability to amend her complaint to allege additional facts in her possession that would support the dismissed claims. The Clerk is directed to ISSUE PROCESS to the Murfreesboro Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/15/18. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 15, 2018 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/15/18. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The TRO motion (Doc. No. 3) is DENIED without prejudice to Plaintiff's filing another motion for a temporary or permanent injunction that complies with Rule 65 and otherwise makes a strong showing of entitlement to such relief. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/14/18. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 13, 2018 NOTICE mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (dt)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
August 10, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by April Tenille Norris. (dt)
August 10, 2018 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by April Tenille Norris. (dt)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chariot Pointe Apartments, Murfreesboro Housing Authority, Murfreesboro Leased Housing Associates and Volunteer Behavioral Health System, filed by April Tenille Norris.(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norris v. Murfreesboro Leased Housing Associates et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chariot Pointe Apartments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murfreesboro Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volunteer Behavioral Health System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murfreesboro Leased Housing Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mental Health Cooperative
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murfreesboro Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP
Represented By: Angelita E. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominium Management Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murfreesboro, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rutherford County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Tenille Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?