Gipson Mechanical Contractors, Inc. v. Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 572 Building Corporation
Plaintiff: Gipson Mechanical Contractors, Inc.
Defendant: Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 572 Building Corporation and U.A. Local 572 of the United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitters Industry of the United States and Canada (AFL-CIO)
Case Number: 3:2018cv00768
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:151
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Amended Complaint by Gipson Mechanical Contractors, Inc.. (Frick, Scott)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Given the filing of a Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 12), it is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for October 15, 2018 is CONTINUED, to be reset, if appropriate, following disposition of this motion. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/9/2018. (jw)
September 27, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Amended Complaint by Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 572 Building Corporation, U.A. Local 572 of the United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitters Industry of the United States and Canada (AFL-CIO). (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A Contract)(Godwin, Deborah)
September 13, 2018 Filing 11 Summons issued as to U.A. Local 572 of the United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitters Industry of the United States and Canada (AFL-CIO). Service copies mailed to counsel for service. (jw)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The filing of the Amended Complaint (Docket No. 6) renders moot the pending Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 5). The Motion to Dismiss is therefore DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/7/2018. (jw)
September 7, 2018 Filing 9 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #6 Amended Complaint. (Frick, Scott)
September 6, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Gipson Mechanical Contractors, Inc.. (Frick, Scott)
September 6, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by Gipson Mechanical Contractors, Inc. re #6 Amended Complaint of Service (Frick, Scott)
September 6, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants, filed by Gipson Mechanical Contractors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2013 Working Agreement)(Frick, Scott)
August 23, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 572 Building Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate and Charter)(Godwin, Deborah)
August 16, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2018 at 2:45 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (mg)
August 16, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Scott A. Frick, and Deborah Godwin. (mg)
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 572 Building Corporation from Circuit Court of Davidson County, Tennessee, case number 18C1854. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-2732544) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Circuit Court Complaint for Damages, #3 Exhibit 1 - Circuit Court Summons, #4 Exhibit 2 - Notice to State Court of Removal, #5 Attachment - Notice to Plaintiff and Counsel of Removal)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gipson Mechanical Contractors, Inc. v. Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 572 Building Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 572 Building Corporation
Represented By: Deborah Godwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.A. Local 572 of the United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitters Industry of the United States and Canada (AFL-CIO)
Represented By: Deborah Godwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gipson Mechanical Contractors, Inc.
Represented By: Scott A. Frick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?