Ricci et al v. Hideout Pictures, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Ricci and Ed Lamberg
Defendant: Country Music Television, Inc., Hideout Pictures, LLC, Viacom, Inc. and Flatwoods Productions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00771
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney(s) Jamie S. Raghu to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2774779) by Country Music Television, Inc., Flatwoods Productions, Inc., Hideout Pictures, LLC, Viacom, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment J. Raghu Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Attachment Proposed Order Granting Motion Pro Hac Vice J. Raghu)(Harvey, Robb)
October 15, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney(s) Elizabeth A. McNamara to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2774770) by Country Music Television, Inc., Flatwoods Productions, Inc., Hideout Pictures, LLC, Viacom, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment E. McNamara Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Attachment Proposed Order Granting Motion Pro Hac Vice E. McNamara)(Harvey, Robb)
September 21, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Robb S. Harvey. (jm)
September 20, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Country Music Television, Inc., Flatwoods Productions, Inc., Hideout Pictures, LLC, Viacom, Inc.. (Harvey, Robb)
September 20, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by Country Music Television, Inc., Flatwoods Productions, Inc., Hideout Pictures, LLC, Viacom, Inc. OF SPECIAL APPEARANCE (Harvey, Robb)
August 31, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for James R. Wiggington. (jw)
August 29, 2018 Filing 7 Summons issued as to Country Music Television, Inc., Flatwoods Productions, Inc., Hideout Pictures, LLC and Viacom, Inc. (gb)
August 29, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Wiggington on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wiggington, James)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/22/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (gb)
August 20, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for John Tennyson. (gb)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (gb)
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Country Music Television, Inc., Flatwoods Productions, Inc., Hideout Pictures, LLC, Viacom, Inc. (Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0650-2733895), filed by Dennis Ricci, Ed Lamberg. Service copies will be picked up by counsel. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Registration, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ricci et al v. Hideout Pictures, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Music Television, Inc.
Represented By: Robb S. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hideout Pictures, LLC
Represented By: Robb S. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom, Inc.
Represented By: Robb S. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flatwoods Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Robb S. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Ricci
Represented By: John Tennyson
Represented By: James R. Wiggington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ed Lamberg
Represented By: John Tennyson
Represented By: James R. Wiggington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?