Allen v. Tramuto et al

Plaintiff: Andrew H. Allen
Defendant: Robert J. Greczyn, Jr., Mary Jane England, Peter Hudson, Archelle Georgiou, Bradley S. Karro, Paul H. Keckley, Glenn Hargreaves, Conan J. Laughlin, Donato Tramuto, Kevin G. Wills, Lee A. Shapiro, Adam Holland and Tivity Health, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00797
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is TRANSFERRED to Chief Judge Crenshaw, as it is related to an earlier-filed case assigned to him. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/18/2018. (mg)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: Given the transfer of this case to Chief Judge Crenshaw, it is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled before Judge Trauger on October 29, 2018 is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/15/2018. (mg)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion to Continue the initial case management conference that the Court set for Monday, October 29, 2018. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/16/2018. (mg)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: The files of these consolidated actions (3:18-cv-797), shall be maintained in one file under Master Docket No. 3:18-cv-00087. Following the entry of this Order, this case will continue to be stayed consistent with the Order Staying Case entered on February 22, 2018, in the Denham Action, which will remain in full force and effect and be applicable to all parties of this now-consolidated action. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/15/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
October 15, 2018 Filing 31 Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conf. by Andrew H. Allen. (Pepper, J.)
October 10, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE by Andrew H. Allen of Filing of Stipulation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tivity Stipulation)(Pepper, J.)
September 18, 2018 Filing 29 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Tivity Health, Inc.. (Crace, Joseph)
September 13, 2018 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew H. Allen. Tivity Health, Inc. waiver sent on 9/6/2018. (Pepper, J.)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Geoffrey M. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/13/2018. (mg)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Scott R. Jacobsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/13/2018. (mg)
September 13, 2018 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew H. Allen. Kevin G. Wills waiver sent on 9/6/2018. (Pepper, J.)
September 13, 2018 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew H. Allen. Paul H. Keckley waiver sent on 9/6/2018. (Pepper, J.)
September 13, 2018 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew H. Allen. Lee A. Shapiro waiver sent on 9/6/2018. (Pepper, J.)
September 13, 2018 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew H. Allen. Conan J. Laughlin waiver sent on 9/6/2018. (Pepper, J.)
September 13, 2018 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew H. Allen. Bradley S. Karro waiver sent on 9/6/2018. (Pepper, J.)
September 13, 2018 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew H. Allen. Peter Hudson waiver sent on 9/6/2018. (Pepper, J.)
September 13, 2018 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew H. Allen. Robert J. Greczyn, Jr waiver sent on 9/6/2018. (Pepper, J.)
September 13, 2018 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew H. Allen. Archelle Georgiou waiver sent on 9/6/2018. (Pepper, J.)
September 13, 2018 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew H. Allen. Mary Jane England waiver sent on 9/6/2018. (Pepper, J.)
September 13, 2018 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew H. Allen. Glenn Hargreaves waiver sent on 9/6/2018. (Pepper, J.)
September 13, 2018 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew H. Allen. Adam Holland waiver sent on 9/6/2018. (Pepper, J.)
September 13, 2018 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew H. Allen. Donato Tramuto waiver sent on 9/6/2018. (Pepper, J.)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal and to have impounded, the unredacted Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/12/2018. (mg)
September 12, 2018 OH State Bar status verified as active for Geoffrey M. Johnson, and NY State Bar status verified as active for Scott Jacobsen. (mg)
September 12, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney(s) Geoffrey M. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2751228) by Andrew H. Allen. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing (Geoffrey M. Johnson))(Pepper, J.)
September 12, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney(s) Scott R. Jacobsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2751221) by Andrew H. Allen. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing (Scott R. Jacobsen))(Pepper, J.)
September 11, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Joseph B. Crace, Jr. (mg)
September 10, 2018 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Lisa R. Bugni filed by Mary Jane England, Archelle Georgiou, Robert J. Greczyn, Jr, Glenn Hargreaves, Adam Holland, Peter Hudson, Bradley S. Karro, Paul H. Keckley, Conan J. Laughlin, Lee A. Shapiro, Donato Tramuto, Kevin G. Wills re: #9 Response in Support of Motion,. (Crace, Joseph)
September 10, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Support re #2 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal Unredacted Complaint filed by Mary Jane England, Archelle Georgiou, Robert J. Greczyn, Jr, Glenn Hargreaves, Adam Holland, Peter Hudson, Bradley S. Karro, Paul H. Keckley, Conan J. Laughlin, Lee A. Shapiro, Donato Tramuto, Kevin G. Wills. (Crace, Joseph)
September 10, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph B. Crace, Jr on behalf of Mary Jane England, Archelle Georgiou, Robert J. Greczyn, Jr, Glenn Hargreaves, Adam Holland, Peter Hudson, Bradley S. Karro, Paul H. Keckley, Conan J. Laughlin, Lee A. Shapiro, Donato Tramuto, Kevin G. Wills (Crace, Joseph)
August 28, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2018 at 2:15 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (jw)
August 28, 2018 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Mary Jane England, Archelle Georgiou, Robert J. Greczyn, Jr, Glenn Hargreaves, Adam Holland, Peter Hudson, Bradley S. Karro, Paul H. Keckley, Conan J. Laughlin, Lee A. Shapiro, Donato Tramuto, Kevin G. Wills. Service copies will be picked up by counsel. (jw)
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Andrew H. Allen. (jw)
August 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw)
August 27, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Geoffrey M. Johnson, Scott Jacobsen: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 9/17/2018. (jw)
August 27, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for J. Ross Pepper, Jr, Sara R. Ellis; OH State Bar status verified as active for Geoffrey M. Johnson; NY State Bar status verified as active for Scott Jacobsen. (jw)
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 Sealed Document Unredacted Complaint filed by Andrew H. Allen. (Pepper, J.)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal Unredacted Complaint by Andrew H. Allen. (Pepper, J.)
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mary Jane England, Archelle Georgiou, Robert J. Greczyn, Jr, Glenn Hargreaves, Adam Holland, Peter Hudson, Bradley S. Karro, Paul H. Keckley, Conan J. Laughlin, Lee A. Shapiro, Donato Tramuto, Kevin G. Wills (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2738527), filed by Andrew H. Allen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Tramuto et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Greczyn, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph B. Crace, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Jane England
Represented By: Joseph B. Crace, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Hudson
Represented By: Joseph B. Crace, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archelle Georgiou
Represented By: Joseph B. Crace, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley S. Karro
Represented By: Joseph B. Crace, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul H. Keckley
Represented By: Joseph B. Crace, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Hargreaves
Represented By: Joseph B. Crace, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conan J. Laughlin
Represented By: Joseph B. Crace, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donato Tramuto
Represented By: Joseph B. Crace, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin G. Wills
Represented By: Joseph B. Crace, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee A. Shapiro
Represented By: Joseph B. Crace, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Holland
Represented By: Joseph B. Crace, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tivity Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew H. Allen
Represented By: Sara R. Ellis
Represented By: Scott Jacobsen
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Johnson
Represented By: J. Ross Pepper, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?