Fedorchak v. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Daniel Fedorchak
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00823
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Filing 13 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Initial) filed by Daniel Fedorchak. (Jackson, R.)
October 19, 2018 Filing 12 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Stevens, C.)
October 19, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc..(Stevens, C.)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to complaint. By no later than OCTOBER 19, 2018, Defendant must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 10/11/2018. (BH)
October 1, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (UNOPPOSED) by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment (Proposed) Order)(Leatherman, Malcolm)
October 1, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Malcolm Levy Leatherman. (am)
September 28, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Malcolm Levy Leatherman on behalf of LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (Leatherman, Malcolm)
September 27, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for C. Eric Stevens. (am)
September 26, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Eric Stevens on behalf of LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (Stevens, C.)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 9/5/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (mg)
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 Summons issued as to LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. Service copies will be picked up by counsel. (mg)
September 4, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for R. Scott Jackson, Jr. (mg)
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2743941), filed by Daniel Fedorchak. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fedorchak v. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Fedorchak
Represented By: R. Scott Jackson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Malcolm Levy Leatherman
Represented By: C. Eric Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?