United States of America v. Bowles

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Dean Bowles
Case Number: 3:2018cv00829
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
0 Judge: William L Campbell
1 Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference by United States of America. (Phillips, Debra)
November 2, 2018 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Amy Donlon filed by United States of America re: #8 MOTION for Default Judgment as to . (Phillips, Debra)
November 2, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Default Judgment as to by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - ENTRY OF DEFAULT)(Phillips, Debra)
September 26, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by United States of America. Dean Bowles served on 9/7/2018. (Phillips, Debra)
September 10, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Disregard DE #5 - entered in error. (jw)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 9/7/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ***DISREGARD - ENTERED in ERROR*** ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 9/7/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw) Modified on 9/10/2018 (jw).
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Dean Bowles. (gb)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/5/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 661 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (gb)
September 5, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Debra Teufel Phillips. (gb)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dean Bowles, filed by United States of America. Service copies will be picked up by counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Promissory Note, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Bowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Bowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Debra Teufel Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?