Oguoma v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Chimmezirim Oguoma
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services and Cindy Gomez
Case Number: 3:2018cv00830
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Joe Brown
Referring Judge: William L Campbell
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08:1421
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Parties' Joint Motion to Remand #9 is GRANTED. The Application is remanded with instructions to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services to reopen the Application and issue a new decision within 60 days of entry of this Order. This action is DISMISSED, without prejudice, and the Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/16/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 12, 2018 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Remand to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services by Cindy Gomez, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Maynor-Faulcon, Mercedes)
September 18, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Cindy Gomez on 09/13/2018, filed by Chimmezirim Oguoma. (Rose, Linda)
September 18, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Jeff Sessions on 09/14/2018, filed by Chimmezirim Oguoma. (Rose, Linda)
September 18, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Melissa Russell for Donald Cochran on 09/10/2018, filed by Chimmezirim Oguoma. (Rose, Linda)
September 18, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Mercedes C. Maynor-Faulcon. (jm)
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mercedes C. Maynor-Faulcon on behalf of United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Maynor-Faulcon, Mercedes)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joe Brown for consideration of all pretrial matters. Any dispositive motions file shall be considered by the Magistrate Judge, who shall submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for disposition. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 9/10/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail.) (jm)
September 5, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Linda Rose. (jm)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cindy Gomez, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2744613), filed by Chimmezirim Oguoma. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oguoma v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Mercedes C. Maynor-Faulcon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Gomez
Represented By: Mercedes C. Maynor-Faulcon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chimmezirim Oguoma
Represented By: Linda Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?