Miller v. Northpoint Recovery Service LLC et al

Plaintiff: John Miller
Defendant: Jeremy Poehler, Northpoint Recovery Service LLC and National Debt Holdings LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00837
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
0 Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
1 Judge: Barbara D Holmes
2 Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER: Pursuant to the division of the docket, this case is transferred to Judge Eli J. Richardson. All previously imposed deadlines and Court dates remain unchanged, pending any further order from Judge Richardson. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/19/2018. (mg)
October 19, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER: Due to a conflict the Court needs to reschedule the conference. In addition, a review of the docket shows that no returns of service have yet been filed, and no appearance has been made by any Defendant. Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED from November 5, 2018, to 10:00 a.m, Tuesday, December 4, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 10/19/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
September 18, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER granting #7 Motion for Jeffrey D. Wood to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 9/18/2018. (mg)
September 14, 2018 8 RECEIPT #34675051854 in the amount of $100.00 posted by John Miller re #7 Jeffrey D. Wood Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (mg)
September 13, 2018 7 MOTION for attorney(s) Jeffrey D. Wood to Appear Pro Hac Vice ($100 Fee Paid) by John Miller. (mg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2018: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing) (mg).
September 7, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 9/7/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
September 7, 2018 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/5/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (mg)
September 7, 2018 4 Summons issued as to National Debt Holdings LLC, Northpoint Recovery Service LLC, and Jeremy Poehler. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
September 6, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Jeffrey D. Wood: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 9/27/2018. (mg)
September 6, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for M. Matt Milligan, and OH State Bar status verified as active for Jeffrey D. Wood. (mg)
September 6, 2018 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
September 6, 2018 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
September 4, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against National Debt Holdings LLC, Northpoint Recovery Service LLC, Jeremy Poehler (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2744200), filed by John Miller. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Northpoint Recovery Service LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Poehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northpoint Recovery Service LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Debt Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Miller
Represented By: M. Matt Milligan
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?