Intress et al v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Patrick Steffen and Kristin Intress
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2018cv00851
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
0 Judge: Eli J Richardson
1 Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:6702
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2018 13 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 138, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is TRANSFERRED to Judge Eli Richardson for all purposes. All present deadlines and court dates shall remain in place, subject to modification by Judge Richardson or the magistrate judge. The initial case management conference scheduled before Judge Trauger on December 17, 2019 is CANCELLED. District Judge Aleta A. Trauger no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/7/2018. (jm)
November 8, 2018 12 CERTIFICATE of Service filed by United States of America re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or Alternatively for Summary Judgment filed by United States of America. (Bishop, Kyle)
November 8, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Kyle L. Bishop: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, fee is waived (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 11/29/2018. (jm)
November 8, 2018 Notice to Filer re DE #11 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, all filings shall include a Certificate of Service and it shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel SHALL FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document using the Certificate event located under Other Documents. (jm)
November 6, 2018 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or Alternatively for Summary Judgment by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Bishop, Kyle)
October 9, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER granting #9 Joint MOTION to continue Initial Case Management Conference. Reset for 12/17/2018 at 01:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/9/2018. (jm)
October 4, 2018 9 Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Kristin Intress, Patrick Steffen. (Roberts, Lauren)
October 1, 2018 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle L. Bishop on behalf of United States of America (Bishop, Kyle)
September 26, 2018 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to The United States of America on 09/14/2018 by Kristin Intress, Patrick Steffen. (Roberts, Lauren)
September 18, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER granting #5 Motion for Wilhelm Dingler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/18/2018. (jm)
September 18, 2018 Notice to filer re DE #5 : Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 167-1, Section 8, electronically filed documents shall set forth the Filing User's name, address, telephone number and Board of Professional Responsibility registration number. The filer's name should be typed in the space where the signature would otherwise appear preceded by the symbol s/ or inserted facsimile signature. Also, the document is scanned and not text searchable. Scanning should only be used for documents not created on your computer. This document does not need to be re-filed unless otherwise directed by the Court. (jm)
September 17, 2018 5 MOTION for attorney(s) Wilhelm Dingler to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2754869) by Kristin Intress, Patrick Steffen. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Roberts, Lauren)
September 12, 2018 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/5/2018 at 2:15 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (jm)
September 11, 2018 WA State Bar status verified as active for Wilhelm Dingler. (jm)
September 11, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Wilhelm Dingler: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 10/2/2018. (jm)
September 11, 2018 3 Summons issued as to United States of America.(Service copies will be picked up by counsel.) (jm)
September 11, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Lauren Paxton Roberts. (jm)
September 11, 2018 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
September 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2748130), filed by Kristin Intress, Patrick Steffen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - May 17, 2017 denial letter from IRS, #2 Exhibit B - Dec 7, 2015 Assessment Notice, #3 Exhibit C - Feb 1, 2016 Assessment Notice, #4 Exhibit D - Correspondence to and from IRS, #5 Exhibit E - 2014 e-file Activity Report, #6 Exhibit F - Form 843 Claim for Refund and Request for Abatement, #7 Exhibit G - May 17, 2017 denial letter, #8 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet (jm) Modified on 9/11/2018 (jm). Modified on 9/11/2018 (jm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intress et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Steffen
Represented By: Lauren Paxton Roberts
Represented By: Wilhelm Dingler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Intress
Represented By: Lauren Paxton Roberts
Represented By: Wilhelm Dingler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Kyle L. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?