United States of America v. Manookian
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Brian P. Manookian
Case Number: 3:2018cv00895
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/16/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
November 16, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by United States of America (Jordan, Stephen)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 MOTION to Continuance. The Hearing is reset for 11/30/2018 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 873 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/2/18. (dt)
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Continue Hearing by United States of America. (Jordan, Stephen)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Order Setting Hearing served on Brian P. Manookian on 10/01/2018, filed by United States of America. (Jordan, Stephen)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: IRS Enforcement Hearing set for 11/2/2018 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 873 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/27/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw)
September 21, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Stephen P. Jordan. (jw)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons, #3 Declaration of Lisa Anderson, #4 Proposed Order)(jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Manookian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian P. Manookian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Stephen P. Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?