Kipp v. The Law Office of Jennifer McCoy, P.C.

Plaintiff: Bernie Kipp
Defendant: The Law Office of Jennifer McCoy, P.C.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00896
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
0 Judge: Barbara D Holmes
1 Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2018 6 Summons along with USM-285 form issued as to The Law Office of Jennifer McCoy, P.C. Service copies forwarded to U.S. Marshal to effect service. (mg)
November 14, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER: Plaintiff's request for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Pursuant to Rule 72 of the FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1), this case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for a scheduling order, for decision on all nondispositive matters, and for a Report and Recommendation on dispositive matters. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/13/2018. (mg)
September 25, 2018 4 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Bernie Kipp. (mg)
September 21, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for William M. Kaludis. (mg)
September 21, 2018 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
September 21, 2018 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
September 21, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against The Law Office of Jennifer McCoy, P.C., filed by Bernie Kipp. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Summons, #3 Exhibit 2 - Letter to Bernie Kipp - April 7, 2018)(mg) Modified text on 9/21/2018 (mg). Modified text on 9/25/2018 (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kipp v. The Law Office of Jennifer McCoy, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Law Office of Jennifer McCoy, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernie Kipp
Represented By: William M. Kaludis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?